Idaho Conservation League et al v. Lannom et al
Idaho District Court | |
Judge: | B Lynn Winmill |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00246 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 03, 2016 7:42 AM MST |
Defendant
Keith B Lannom
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Forest Service
1400 Independence Ave., S.W.
Washington, DC 20250 |
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
American Independence Mines & Minerals, LLC
Givens Pursley LLP 601 West Bannock Street
Boise, ID 83702 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earthworks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Friends of the Clearwater
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Idaho Conservation League
P.O. Box 844
Boise, ID 83701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilderness Society
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilderness Watch
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
58 | 58
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 08/29 10:07 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER withdrawing43 Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to the Notice57 stating that the motion was resolved in a settlement. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm) |