|
GPO
May 06 2010
ORDER granting DCI Solutions, Inc's 10 Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(6); denying DCI Solutions, Inc's 11 Motion to Strike Counterclaim Under California Code of Civil Procedure Section 425.16. Court denies motion to strike Urban Outfitter's 1st, 2nd, and 4th counterclaims pursuant to the anti-SLAPP statute. Court grants motion to dismiss w/ respect to Urban Outfitter's 1st, 2nd, 4th, 5th, 6th and 7th counterclaims. All of those counterclaims are dismissed w/ leave to amend. Urban Outfitter shall file an amended counterclaim w/in 21 days from the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/6/2010. (jah) (jrl).
|
|
GPO
Apr 05 2011
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. The Court grants the motion as it relates to DCI's fraud in the inducement claim and denies the motion as it relates to each of DCI's remaining claims. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/5/2011. (jer)(jrd)
|
|
GPO
Dec 01 2011
ORDER granting Defendant Urban Outfitters' 125 Motion to Dismiss Remaining Equitable Counterclaims. Court dismisses w/o prejudice Dft's 4th, 5th and 6th counterclaims for violation of California Business and Professions Code 17200 et seq., declaratory relief and rescission. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/1/2011. (jah) (av1).
|
|
GPO
Jan 30 2012
ORDER Denying Cross Motions for Attorneys' fees. The Court Denies Urbans 132 motion for attorneys fees and DCIs 136 motion for attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/30/12. (ecs)(jrd)
|
|
GPO
Apr 23 2012
ORDER denying Defendant Urban Outfitters, Inc's 153 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/23/2012. (jah)(jrd)
|