Tynes v. Buccaneers Limited Partnership et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | James S Moody, Jr |
Referred: | Anthony E Porcelli |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01594 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 03, 2016 7:38 AM EST |
Defendant
Buccaneers Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
First Allied Development Partners Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Tynes
|
Represented By
|
1. | Tampa Bay Bucaneers reach settlement with former kicker Lawrence Tynes in MRSA lawsuit (tampabay.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/06 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Acknowledgment re Order and Transmittal. (GNB) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on motion to stay discovery Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on motion to dismiss
Thu 09/24 6:56 PM
AMENDED ORDER AS TO FORMATTING ONLY granting 23 motion to remand; terminating 29 motion to stay discovery; terminating 35 motion for leave to file; terminating 7 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/24/2015. (JG) Modified on 9/24/2015 (JG) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Thu 09/24 2:17 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt. #23) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to remand this case to the Circuit Court for the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida. The Clerk is also directed to forward a certified copy of this Order to that Court. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this file and terminate any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/24/2015. (AR) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 09/18 8:26 PM
MOTION for leave to file a Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Lawrence Tynes. (Weinshall, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/16 11:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Lawrence Tynes.(Rosenthal, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Weinshall Declaration | ||
33 | 33
misc
Declaration
Wed 09/16 4:58 PM
DECLARATION of Daniel L. Nash by Buccaneers Limited Partnership.(Megerian, Aram) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response to motion
Wed 09/16 4:55 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re23 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Buccaneers Limited Partnership. (Megerian, Aram) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/11 7:11 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; the deadline is extended to September 16, 2015. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/11/2015. (JG) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/11 5:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 Order on motion to modify by Lawrence Tynes. (Rosenthal, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Stay discovery
Thu 09/10 2:12 PM
First MOTION to stay discovery by Buccaneers Limited Partnership, First Allied Development Partners Limited Partnership.(Megerian, Aram) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on motion to modify
Fri 09/04 11:14 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Unopposed Motion to modify Unopposed Motion for Modification of the Amended Briefing Schedule on the Motions to Remand and to Dismiss. Deadline extension granted through September 14, 2015. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/4/2015. (LN) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Modify
Fri 09/04 10:56 AM
Unopposed MOTION to modify Unopposed Motion for Modification of the Amended Briefing Schedule on the Motions to Remand and to Dismiss with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Buccaneers Limited Partnership. (Megerian, Aram) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice to counsel of Local Rule
Wed 09/02 10:56 AM
SECOND NOTICE to counsel Bradford Sohn and Matthew Weinshall of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (KMM) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice to counsel of Local Rule
Wed 09/02 10:46 AM
SECOND NOTICE to counsel Gregory Knopp, Daniel Nash and James Tysse of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (KMM) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Request for oral argument
Mon 08/24 1:14 PM
REQUEST for oral argument re23 MOTION to remand to State Court by Lawrence Tynes. (Rosenthal, Stephen) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 08/24 1:12 PM
MOTION to remand to State Court by Lawrence Tynes.(Rosenthal, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Stephen F. Rosenthal | ||
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Wed 08/12 3:46 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Gregroy W. Knopp, appearing on behalf of Buccaneers Limited Partnership (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA031636.) Related document:13 MOTION for Gregory W. Knopp to appear pro hac vice. (AG) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Wed 08/12 3:47 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney James E. Tysse, appearing on behalf of Buccaneers Limited Partnership (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA031636.) Related document:14 MOTION for James E. Tysse to appear pro hac vice. (AG) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Wed 08/12 3:48 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Daniel L. Nash, appearing on behalf of Buccaneers Limited Partnership (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA031636.) Related document:15 MOTION for Daniel L. Nash to appear pro hac vice. (AG) |
||
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice to counsel of Local Rule
Fri 08/07 11:10 AM
NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (KMM) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/07 9:28 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Modification of the Briefing Schedule on the Motions to Remand and to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/7/2015. (LN) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/06 1:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Modification of the Briefing Schedule of the Motions to Remand and to Dismiss by Lawrence Tynes. (Rosenthal, Stephen) Modified text and relief on 8/6/2015 (KMM) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice to counsel of Local Rule
Tue 08/04 2:21 PM
NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 as to counsel Bradford Sohn and Matthew Weinshall (signed by deputy clerk). (KMM) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 07/31 1:47 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 motion to appear pro hac vice as to Daniel L. Nash. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/31/2015. (LN) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 07/31 1:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 motion to appear pro hac vice as to James E. Tysse. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/31/2015. (LN) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 07/31 1:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 motion to appear pro hac vice as to Gregory W. Knopp. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/31/2015. (LN) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 07/31 1:40 PM
MOTION for Daniel L. Nash to appear pro hac vice by Buccaneers Limited Partnership. (Borucke, David) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 07/31 1:39 PM
MOTION for James E. Tysse to appear pro hac vice by Buccaneers Limited Partnership. (Borucke, David) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 07/31 1:37 PM
MOTION for Gregory W. Knopp to appear pro hac vice by Buccaneers Limited Partnership. (Borucke, David) |
|
12 | 12
order
Case management and scheduling order
Fri 07/31 9:38 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/7/2016, Dispositive motions due by 4/7/2016, Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, JULY 7, 2016 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr., Jury Trial set for AUGUST 2016 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/31/2015. (AR) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Case Management Report
Fri 07/24 5:30 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Borucke, David) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Thu 07/23 6:24 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases (Closed) per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lawrence Tynes. Related case(s): Yes (Rosenthal, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/22 8:00 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint with Jury Demand by First Allied Development Partners Limited Partnership.(Borucke, David) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Hearing
Wed 07/22 7:58 PM
MOTION for Hearing re7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Buccaneers Limited Partnership. (Borucke, David) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/22 7:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Buccaneers Limited Partnership.(Borucke, David) |
|
Att: 1 Nash Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Declaration | ||
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 07/09 11:27 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 Agreed Motion to the Parties' Stipulated Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/9/2015. (LN) |
|
4 | 4
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Thu 07/09 8:50 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 7/9/2015. (AR) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 07/09 10:23 AM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for entry of stipulated briefing schedule by Buccaneers Limited Partnership, First Allied Development Partners Limited Partnership, Lawrence Tynes. (KMM) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Wed 07/08 4:20 PM
DECLARATION of Michael A. Greenberg re1 Notice of Removal by Buccaneers Limited Partnership, First Allied Development Partners Limited Partnership.(LSS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
2 | 2
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/08 4:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buccaneers Limited Partnership, First Allied Development Partners Limited Partnership with Jury Demand filed by Lawrence Tynes, filed in State Court on 6/8/2015.(LSS) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/08 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 15-CA-4177 filed in State Court on 6/8/2015. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA-31056 filed by First Allied Development Partners Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership.(LSS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |