Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:14-bk-32005

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Judge:R Kimball Mosier
Case #: 2:15-ap-02129
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2015
Terminated:May 19, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Melissa M Sheppick
584 Teresa Street
Kaysville, UT 84037
Represented By
Lou G. Harris
Lincoln Law Center, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 9
Farmington, UT 84025
Represented By
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
court Receipt of Complaint Filing Fee Paid (FEE) Wed 04/12 4:15 PM
Receipt of Complaint Filing Fee Paid in Adversary Proceeding 2:15-ap-2129. This fee was previously Deferred. Receipt Number: 314193. Fee Amount $350. (lmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
court Receipt of Other Fee Paid (FEE) Mon 02/06 12:55 PM
Receipt of Other Fee Paid. Receipt Number: 314193 Fee Amount $350.00 Related [+]. (lmg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 19, 2016
21 21 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (order) Thu 05/19 12:21 PM
Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (mkz)
Related: [-] 19
20 20 misc Pending Order Thu 05/19 9:56 AM
Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) related documents(s):19 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by: (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) Thu 05/19 9:53 AM
Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by David L. Miller and Melissa M Sheppick (Hofmann, George) Modified on 5/19/2016 (mkz)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Thu 05/19 12:24 PM
Adversary Case 15-02129 Disposed. (mkz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
utility Remark Wed 11/18 4:02 PM
Remark. Order Approving Stipulation entered in main case # 14-32005 Please see entry #97. (clo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2015
18 18 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Sun 10/04 10:44 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 10/04/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order
Friday, October 02, 2015
17 17 order Order (generic) (order) Fri 10/02 12:32 PM
Order Concerning Stipulation. The hearing date for the Trustee's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment will be held on November 24, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. The Trustee's Reply to the Motion is due November 17, 2015. Related [+] (lph)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation
court Hearing Set(Motion) Fri 10/02 12:37 PM
Hearing Se Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/24/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court.Deadline for filing objections: 11/17/2015. (lph)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support
Thursday, October 01, 2015
16 16 misc Pending Order Thu 10/01 3:04 PM
Pending Order (Hrg Scheduled/Reserved) related documents(s):15 Stipulation Filed by: Related [+]
Related: [-] iser, Adam
15 15 misc Stipulation Thu 10/01 3:02 PM
Stipulation by and between David L. Miller, Trustee and Melissa M. Sheppick Re Related [+] (Stipulation Concerning Summary Judgment Motion and Hearing Date) Filed by David L. Miller Modified on 10/2/2015 (lph)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff David L. Miller,11 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff David L. Milleriser, Adam
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
14 14 motion Limine (Motion) Tue 09/22 5:41 PM
Motion in Limine Filed by Melissa M Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Objection Tue 09/22 5:39 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Melissa M Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support
Thursday, August 27, 2015
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/27 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by David L. Miller
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Hearingiser, Adam
11 11 notice *Notice of Hearing Thu 08/27 2:07 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Filed by David L. Miller Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court.Deadline for filing objections: 9/15/2015.
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Supportiser, Adam
Thursday, August 20, 2015
10 10 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Thu 08/20 1:18 PM
Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters. Pre-Trial Order due by 5/13/2016. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 5/24/2016 at 10:00AM at US Bankruptcy Court. (mtm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2015
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Mon 08/17 5:21 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by David L. Miller
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support,8 Affidavitiser, Adam
8 8 misc Affidavit/Declaration Mon 08/17 5:20 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] Declaration of David L. Miller Filed by David L. Miller
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Supportiser, Adam
7 7 motion Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support (Motion) Mon 08/17 5:19 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum Filed by David L. Miller Related [+]
Related: [-] iser, Adam
Friday, August 14, 2015
6 6 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (Form 35) Fri 08/14 9:43 AM
Form 35/Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by David L. Miller Related [+]
Related: [-] iser, Adam
Thursday, July 23, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (With Image) Thu 07/23 12:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Tyler J. Jensen on behalf of Melissa M Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conf. (order) Thu 07/23 10:15 AM
Order and Notice of Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/25/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court. Report of Parties Planning Meeting due by 8/14/2015. (jwg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2015
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/22 5:21 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Melissa M Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/08 5:03 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: (Melissa M. Sheppick; aka Melissa M. Cable). (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/08 4:48 PM
Adversary case[LINK 15-02129 . (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)):Complaint by David L. Miller against Melissa M Sheppick. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount $350 (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]