Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:David L Bunning
Referred: Edward B Atkins
Case #: 0:15-cv-00046
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2015
Re-opened:May 25, 2017
Terminated:Aug 18, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 06, 2016 8:22 AM EST
Defendant
Kim Davis
Represented By
Jonathan D. Christman
Liberty Counsel - Orlando
contact info
Roger K. Gannam
Liberty Counsel - Orlando
contact info
Anthony Charles Donahue
Donahue Law Group, P.S.C.
contact info
Official Defendant
Kim Davis
Represented By
Jonathan D. Christman
Liberty Counsel - Orlando
contact info
Roger K. Gannam
Liberty Counsel - Orlando
contact info
Anthony Charles Donahue
Donahue Law Group, P.S.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
David Ermold
Represented By
Joseph Daniel Buckles
Joseph D. Buckles, PLLC
contact info
Thomas Paul Szczygielski
contact info
Plaintiff
David Moore
Represented By
Joseph Daniel Buckles
Joseph D. Buckles, PLLC
contact info
Thomas Paul Szczygielski
contact info

GPO Sep 15 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER, 1) Defendant 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Amended Complaint is granted in part , as to Plaintiff's claims against Kim Davis in her official capacity and denied in part as to Plaintiff's claims against Kim Davis in her personal capacity 2) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 27 is dismissed with respect to Plaintiff's claims against Kim Davis in her official capacity .. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/15/17.(SMT)cc: COR

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
60 60 appeal USCA Order Generic Wed 4:04 PM
ORDER of USCA as to51 Notice of Appeal filed by Kim Davis,58 Notice of Appeal filed by David Ermold, David Moore; The motion to consolidate is DENIED insofar as the cases remain separate for purposes of briefing, although they will be submitted to same panel on the same day; to extent Davis seeks ext of time, she is granted 14 days, briefing will be re-set by separate letter(SMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter