Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:10-cv-00484
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2010
Terminated:Sep 03, 2010
Defendant
HSBC Card Service
Defendant
HSBC Finance Corporation f/k/a Household International, Inc.
Defendant
HSBC Holdings PLC
Plaintiff
Leonard Sunders

GPO Aug 13 2010
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION with Order for Service recommending that this 1 action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to mail copies of this Report and Recommendation to Plaintiff at his address on record and to Plaintiff at 118 Hampstead Avenue, Savannah, Georgia 31405. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerrilyn G. Brill on 8/13/10. (cem) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2010: # (1) Order for Service) (cem). Modified on 8/16/2010 to attach the Order for Service. (cem)
GPO Sep 03 2010
ORDER adopting 13 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 9/3/10. (cem)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.