Marlow Humbert v. Dominick Griffin
Original Case: 1:11-cv-00440
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv.pr-01768 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 08, 2017 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
BALTIMORE CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FREDERICK BEALEFELD, Police Commissioner Individually and as Police Commissioner, Baltimore City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
MICHAEL BRASSELL, Police Officer Individually and as Police Officer, Baltimore City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
CINESE CALDWELL, Laboratory Technician individually and as Police Officer, Baltimore City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
SHEILA DIXON, former Mayor of the City of Baltimore, in her individual capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOES, Individually and as currently unknown Police Officers, Baltimore City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARTIN O'MALLEY, Individually and as Governor of the State of Maryland and former Mayor of the City of Baltimore
|
|
Defendant
KEITH MERRYMAN, Detective Individually and as Police Officer, Baltimore City Police Department
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD AND JANE ROES 1-20
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DOMINICK GRIFFIN, Detective Individually and as Police Officer, Baltimore City Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHRIS JONES, Detective Sergeant Individually and as Police Officer, Baltimore City Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CAPRICE SMITH, Detective Individually and as Police Officer, Baltimore City Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARLOW HUMBERT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/25/2017 3:13 PM EDT |
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
2 | 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-00440-WDQ. Mailed to: Melodie Hengerer. 15-1768 (BHR) | |
3 | 3 FEE NOTICE issued to Marlow Humbert - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 08/10/2015 Originating case number: 1:11-cv-00440-WDQ. Mailed to: Melodie Hengerer, Roman Choma. 15-1768 (BHR) | |
4 | 4 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:11-cv-00440-WDQ. Case manager: BarbaraRowe. 15-1768 (BHR) |