Neuroth et al v. Mendocino County et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Nandor J Vadas |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-03226 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 06, 2016 6:46 AM PST |
Defendant
Sheriff Thomas D. Allman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer L. Caudillo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Taylor Fithian, M.D.
California Forensic Medical Group 2511 Garden Road Suite A-160
Monterey, CA 93940 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mendocino County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Neuroth
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Joan C. Nygren
Terminated: 10/21/2015
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed in federal court in 2014 death of Mendocino County Jail inmate (ukiahdailyjournal.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/03/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
85 | 85
minutes
Motion Hearing
Tue 06/28 11:20 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings not held before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas: Motion Hearing not held on 6/28/2016. re 65 First MOTION removal of improper confidentiality designations by non-party City of Willits filed by James Neuroth. Notice of Impending Reassignment to a District Judge to be filed.FTR Time 10:04-10:06. Plaintiff Attorney T. Kennedy Helm IV. Defendant Attorney No appearance. This is a text only Minute Entry (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/28/2016) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
84 | 84
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Craig Bernardi.. (Keck, Anne) (Filed on 6/27/2016) |
|
83 | 83
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christine De Los Santos.. (Keck, Anne) (Filed on 6/27/2016) |
|
82 | 82
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank Masterson.. (Keck, Anne) (Filed on 6/27/2016) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
81 | 81
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Neuroth. Christine De Los Santos served on 6/21/2016, answer due 7/12/2016. (Helm, T.) (Filed on 6/22/2016) |
|
80 | 80
![]() Letter Brief re61 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byThomas D. Allman, Mendocino County. (Keck, Anne) (Filed on 6/22/2016) |
|
79 | 79
![]() First Discovery Letter Brief re: confidentiality designations filed by James Neuroth. (Helm, T.) (Filed on 6/22/2016) |
|
78 | 78
![]() Letter from David F Beach and Scott Lewis . (Beach, David) (Filed on 6/22/2016) |