Maryland District Court
Judge:Paula Xinis
Referred: William Connelly
Case #: 8:15-cv-02062
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2015
Terminated:Apr 20, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jan 10, 2016 6:28 AM EST
Defendant
Host Hotel & Resorts of Virginia, L.P.
Defendant
Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Charles Szczesny
Budow And Noble PC
contact info
Walter E Gillcrist, Jr.
Budow And Noble, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Host Hotels & Resorts of Virginia, L.P.
Represented By
Joseph Charles Szczesny
Budow And Noble PC
contact info
Walter E Gillcrist, Jr.
Budow And Noble, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cecil F Motley, Jr
4609 Palos Verdes Dr North
Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274
Represented By
Wayne Jerry King
Wayne King And Associates
contact info

GPO Apr 20 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/20/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, January 18, 2018
93 93 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 01/18 12:31 PM
MANDATE of USCA takes effect today as to88 Notice of Appeal filed by Cecil F Motley, Jr (krc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]