Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:15-cv-00597
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2015
Terminated:Feb 23, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 13, 2016 7:25 AM CST
Counter Defendant
Yeti Coolers, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Daniel Gray
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Joseph J. Berghammer
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
contact info
Nicholas R. Battey
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
contact info
Kevin J. Meek
Baker Botts, LLP
contact info
Michael Krashin
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
contact info
Mysha Lubke
Baker Botts LLP
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
RTIC Coolers, LLC
Represented By
P. Weston Musselman, Jr.
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Bailey Harris
Fish & Richardson, LLC
contact info
W. Thomas Jacks
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Ricardo J. Bonilla
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Neil J. McNabnay
Fish & Richardson, PC
contact info
Defendant
RTIC Coolers, LLC
Represented By
P. Weston Musselman, Jr.
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Bailey Harris
Fish & Richardson, LLC
contact info
W. Thomas Jacks
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Ricardo J. Bonilla
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Neil J. McNabnay
Fish & Richardson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Yeti Coolers, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Daniel Gray
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Joseph J. Berghammer
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
contact info
Nicholas R. Battey
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
contact info
Kevin J. Meek
Baker Botts, LLP
contact info
Michael Krashin
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.
contact info
Mysha Lubke
Baker Botts LLP
contact info
Special Master
Karl Bayer
Represented By
Karl O. Bayer, Jr.
Karl Bayer, Attorney
contact info

GPO Nov 16 2016
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 134 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
GPO Dec 30 2016
ORDER MOOTING 154 Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 157 Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING 161 Sealed Motion to Compel; GRANTING 163 Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART 168 Motion to Compel; GRANTING IN PART 168 Motion for Contempt; GRANTING 172 Sealed Motion to Continue; GRANTING 178 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
GPO Jan 09 2017
ORDER DENYING 242 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
GPO Jan 27 2017
td)ORDER GRANTING 183 Motion to exclude (Joe Martino); GRANTING 199 Motion to exclude (Kirk D. Deeter); GRANTING 205 Sealed Motion to exclude (Dan Nelson); GRANTING 206 Sealed Motion to exclude (Jim Draper). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (
GPO Jan 27 2017
ORDER GRANTING 247 Sealed Motion to Exclude (David Kazmer). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
GPO Jan 27 2017
ORDER DENYING 207 Sealed Motion to Exclude (Jeffrey M. Samuels). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
GPO Jan 27 2017
ORDER GRANTING 229 Sealed Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Tülin Erdem. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
GPO Jan 27 2017
ORDER DENYING 237 Sealed Motion to Exclude (Yoram Wind). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
GPO Jan 28 2017
ORDER DENYING 227 Sealed Motion to Exclude (Peter Golder). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
GPO Jan 28 2017
ORDER DENYING 208 Sealed Motion to Exclude (Wayne Hoyer). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
GPO Jan 28 2017
ORDER DENYING 238 Sealed Motion to Exclude (Rebecca Kirk Fair). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
GPO Jul 26 2017
ORDER GRANTING 391 Motion to Enforce Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
394 394 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 07/26 11:21 AM
ORDER GRANTING391 Motion to Enforce Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
Related: [-]