Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-40525

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Edward J Coleman III
Case #: 4:15-ap-04037
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2015
Terminated:Jun 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
James T. Turner, Jr.
1403 River Oaks Dr.
Richmond Hill, GA 31324
Represented By
C. James McCallar, Jr.
Mccallar Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Brent Harlander
Represented By
Daniel Christian Jenkins
Karsman, Mckenzie & Hart
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard P. Van Benschoten
Represented By
Daniel Christian Jenkins
Karsman, Mckenzie & Hart
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott McKenna
Represented By
Daniel Christian Jenkins
Karsman, Mckenzie & Hart
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
90 90 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/08 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 88
Monday, June 05, 2017
89 89 court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/05 3:18 PM
Adversary Case 4:15-ap-4037 Closed (CHA)
Related: [-]
88 88 order District Court re: Appeal Mon 06/05 3:12 PM
Final Order By District Court Judge J. Randal Hall, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 4:17-cv-00075 , Dismissed With Prejudice Filed on 6/5/2017 Related [+]. (CHA)
Related: [-] 63 ,65
Friday, June 02, 2017
87 87 misc Stipulation Fri 06/02 3:18 PM
Stipulation By James T. Turner Jr. and Brent Harlander of Dismissal with Prejudice . Filed by C. James McCallar Jr. on behalf of James T. Turner Jr. Related [+] (McCallar, C.)
Related: [-] 1