Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Timothy J Savage
Case #: 2:15-cv-04028
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2015
Terminated:Jan 22, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Jan 17, 2016 9:24 AM EST
Defendant
ADP TOTALSOURCE
Represented By
JOHN M. NOLAN, III
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
MARJORIE KAYE, JR.
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
Defendant
CONNELLY, LLC
Represented By
ZAK T. GOLDSTEIN
Gordon & Rees
contact info
ANDREW C. LUCKING
Gordon And Reese
contact info
ALEXANDER NEMIROFF
Gordon & Rees, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JACKIE GRAHAM
Represented By
J. STEPHEN WOODSIDE
J. Stephen Woodside, P.C.
contact info
Unrepresented Party
ADP TOTALSOURCE
5800 WINDWARD PARKWAY
ALPHARETTA, GA 30005
Represented By
JOHN M. NOLAN, III
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
MARJORIE KAYE, JR.
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 22, 2016
39 39 order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 01/22 2:03 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/20/15. 1/22/15 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
38 38 misc Report Of Wed 01/20 2:17 PM
Report Of Issues Between Parties are Settled by CONNELLY, LLC. (NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
37 37 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 01/12 4:05 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT COTIVITI, LLC, F/K/A CONNELLY, LLC, MAY FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO LATER THAN 1/27/2016. PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO THE MOTION NO LATER THAN 2/12/2016, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/12/2016.1/12/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 01/12 9:07 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Deadline for Summary Judgment filed by CONNELLY, LLC.Certificate of Service.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2016
35 35 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 01/11 3:38 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO.34 ), IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANT ADP TOTALSOURCE MAY FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO LATER THAN 1/27/2016, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/11/2016.1/11/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2016
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 01/08 6:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment filed by ADP TOTALSOURCE.Certificate of Service.(KAYE, MARJORIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 07, 2016
33 33 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 01/08 9:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL Settlement Conference held on 1/7/2016. (amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2015
32 32 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 12/30 9:06 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/7/2016, AT 2:00 PM, IN COURTROOM 7, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 12/29/2015. 12/30/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2015
31 31 minutes Status Conference Mon 12/21 3:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Status Conference held on 12/18/2015. (amas)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion to Take Deposition Mon 12/21 3:30 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JACKIE GRAHAM (DOC. NO.29 ), IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/21/2015.12/21/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
29 29 motion Take Deposition Thu 12/17 3:54 PM
MOTION to Take Deposition from Jackie Graham Motion to Compel Deposition of Jackie Graham filed by CONNELLY, LLC.Certificate of Service.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2015
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/19 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ZAK T. GOLDSTEIN on behalf of CONNELLY, LLC (GOLDSTEIN, ZAK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
27 27 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 11/19 2:33 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (DOC. NO.10 ), IS DENIED AS MOOT. THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/23/2015, IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/17/2015.11/19/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/19 12:14 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/5/2016, AT 2:00 PM, IN COURTROOM 7, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 11/18/2015. 11/19/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
25 25 order Order to Show Cause Tue 11/17 3:11 PM
ORDER THAT A HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED UPON THE PLAINTIFF IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/23/2015, AT 9:15 AM, IN COURTROOM 9A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/16/2015. 11/17/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Praecipe/Request Tue 11/17 9:44 AM
Praecipe to Withdraw Defendant Cotiviti's Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiff by CONNELLY, LLC. (NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER) Modified on 11/18/2015 (lvj, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2015
23 23 motion Sanctions Fri 11/13 12:08 PM
MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiff filed by CONNELLY, LLC.Order, Motion for Sanctions, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, Exhibits.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2015
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/11 6:15 PM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service by ADP TOTALSOURCE.(KAYE, MARJORIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
21 21 order Order Mon 11/02 1:49 PM
ORDER THAT THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED AS OF 10/28/2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/2/2015. 11/2/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2015
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 10/29 2:24 PM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint by CONNELLY, LLC.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/29 12:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADP TOTALSOURCE, CONNELLY, LLC, filed by JACKIE GRAHAM.(amas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2015
18 18 order Order on Motion for Order Mon 10/26 10:21 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT COTIVITI'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (DOC. NO.17 ), IS GRANTED. NO LATER THAN 11/3/2015, THE PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE UPON COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT FULL AND COMPLETE ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND THEIR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/23/2015.10/26/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Order Fri 10/23 11:31 AM
MOTION for Order Compelling Discovery from Plaintiff filed by CONNELLY, LLC.Certificate of Service.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/16 4:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 12/18/2015. COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CONTACT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANGELL'S CHAMBERS BY 11/18/2015, TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 1/13/2016. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA NO LATER THAN 2/17/2016. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 2/26/2016. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/15/2016, AT 10:00 AM, IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 9614). THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 3/17/2016, AT 9:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 9A. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/16/2015. 9/16/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Wed 09/16 4:26 PM
ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING DEFAULT STANDARDS, OUTLINED HEREIN, SHALL APPLY UNTIL SUCH TIME, IF EVER, THE PARTIES CONDUCT E-DISCOVERY ON A CONSENSUAL BASIS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/16/2015. 9/16/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 09/16 8:39 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ADP TotalSource Group, Inc. by ADP TOTALSOURCE.(KAYE, MARJORIE)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/16 8:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. NOLAN, III on behalf of ADP TOTALSOURCE, ADP TOTALSOURCE (NOLAN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/16 8:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARJORIE KAYE, JR on behalf of ADP TOTALSOURCE, ADP TOTALSOURCE (KAYE, MARJORIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2015
11 11 misc Status Report Fri 09/11 5:20 PM
STATUS REPORT of Rule 26(f) Meeting by CONNELLY, LLC. (LUCKING, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2015
10 10 motion Dismiss Thu 09/10 11:10 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal filed by CONNELLY, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/09 2:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADP TOTALSOURCE. ADP TOTALSOURCE waiver sent on 9/8/2015, answer due 11/9/2015. (WOODSIDE, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
8 8 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 08/31 12:34 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CONNELLY, LLC.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Mon 08/31 11:15 AM
LETTER RE: RECEIPT OF STATE COURT RECORD TO THE PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS ON 8/24/2015. (amas) (FILED IN ERROR, RE-FILED IN CORRECT CASE 15-2526 Modified on 8/31/2015 (amas). (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/31/2015) (amas, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
6 6 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 08/26 1:42 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 9/16/2015, AT 9:30 AM, IN ROOM 9614, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/26/2015. 8/26/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/26 1:38 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO.3 ), IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT CONNOLLY, LLC SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 9/11/2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/26/2015.8/26/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/25 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW C. LUCKING on behalf of CONNELLY, LLC with Certificate of Service(LUCKING, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/21 12:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by CONNELLY, LLC.Certificate of Service.(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/21 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER NEMIROFF on behalf of CONNELLY, LLC with Certificate of Service(NEMIROFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/21 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT against ADP TOTALSOURCE, CONNELLY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE124661), filed by JACKIE GRAHAM.(jmv, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued Tue 07/21 4:43 PM
Summons Issued as to ADP TOTALSOURCE, CONNELLY, LLC. Forwarded To: 2 Origs mailed to counsel on 7/21/15 (jmv, )
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 07/21 4:43 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JACKIE GRAHAM. (jmv, )
Related: [-]
adr Case Eligible for Arbitration Wed 07/22 9:31 AM
Case Eligible for Arbitration(jmv, )
Related: [-]