District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Case #: 1:15-cv-01198
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Violation 5th & 8th Amendme
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 19, 2016 8:22 AM EST
Defendant
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By
Matthew Robert Blecher
Office Of The Attorney General For The District Of Columbia
contact info
William Frederick Causey
Office Of The Attorney General For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Defendant
HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFONT, LLC
Represented By
Robert Boyd
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
contact info
Clare M. Cavaliero
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
contact info
Michael S. McNamara
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER, LLC
Represented By
Robert Boyd
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
contact info
Clare M. Cavaliero
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
contact info
Michael S. McNamara
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRW, INC.
Represented By
Wendell Landray Taylor
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Jonathan Herman Lasken
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC.
Represented By
Wendell Landray Taylor
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Jonathan Herman Lasken
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
THE WHARF, INC.
t/a THE WHARF 1100 Maine Avenue, S.W.
Washington, DC 20024
Represented By
Wendell Landray Taylor
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WHARF, INC.
Represented By
Wendell Landray Taylor
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Brian C. Hauser
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Jonathan Herman Lasken
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 28 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 28, 2015. (NS)
GPO Sep 28 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 28, 2015. (NS)
GPO Jan 12 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 12, 2017. (NS)
GPO Jul 05 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION with regard to 92 Motion to Dismiss the Claims Asserted in the Second Amended Complaint against Defendants Wharf District GP Joint Venture LLC, Wharf Horizontal Reit LLC, Hoffman-Struever Waterfront LLC, and Wharf District Joint Venture LP. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/05/2017. (DM)
GPO Dec 14 2017
Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/14/2017. (DM)MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Motion to Dismiss Claims Asserted in the Third Amended Complaint against Defendants Wharf District GP Joint Venture LLP, Wharf Horizontal Reit LLC, Hoffman-Struever Waterfront LLC, and Wharf District Joint Venture LP.
GPO Mar 30 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Defendant District of Columbia's 190 Motion for Summary Judgment and Developer Defendants' [192 (sealed)/193 (redacted)] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Executive Summary for a summary of the findings herein. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/30/2021. (DM)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, December 02, 2021
230 230 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/02 2:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by BRW, INC., SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC., WHARF, INC.. (Range, John)
Related: [-]