Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:15-cr-00462
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2015
Defendant
Abimael Cruz-Rodriguez
Defendant
Alex Santiago-Crespo
Defendant
Alexander Rivera-Carrion
Defendant
Alexis Cartagena-Gerena
Defendant
Alvin A. Cabezas-Cintron
Defendant
Amaury Mendez-Rosado
Defendant
Analdi Tanco-Moreno
Defendant
Angel L. Cotto-Negron
Defendant
Angel L. Soto-Ramos
Defendant
Anky
Defendant
Anthony Espada-Colon
Defendant
Ardilla
Defendant
Arnaldo Alicea-Colon
Defendant
Astrid J. Martinez-Valentin
Defendant
Billy Villanueva-Carrasquillo
Defendant
Bryan Martinez
Defendant
Carlos E. Brioso-Collantes
Defendant
Carlos M. Guerrero-Castro
Defendant
Carlos Ruben Baez-Miranda
Defendant
Carlos Velazquez-Fontanez
Defendant
Charlie J. Fournier-Collazo
Defendant
Cheo
Defendant
Cheo Cedeno
Defendant
Christian Morales-Castro
Defendant
Christian Vazquez-Hernandez
Defendant
Dalmata
Defendant
Damian Fernandez-Jorge
Defendant
Daniel De Jesus-Diaz
Defendant
Daniel O. Martinez-Velez
Defendant
David E. Rodriguez-Castro
Defendant
David Garcia-Franco
Defendant
Denzel Rodriguez-Caraballo
Defendant
Edgar Gonzalez-Rivera
Defendant
Edgardo Luna-Lopez
Defendant
Edgardo R. Ruano-Chevere
Defendant
El Negro
Defendant
Emanuel Zabala-Perez
Defendant
Emmanuel Zavala-Perez
Defendant
Ernesto Morales-Castro
Defendant
Ezier Clemente-Lamb
Defendant
Felix A. Malave-Torres
Defendant
Felix Rodriguez-Rodriguez
Defendant
Francisco J. Gonzalez-Camacho
Defendant
Francisco Vargas-Sanchez
Defendant
Frank
Defendant
Frankie Rosa-Calderon
Defendant
Giovani Justiniano-Diaz
Defendant
Guillo
Defendant
Hector J. Cruz-Vargas
Defendant
Iram I. Santander-Zulueta
Defendant
Ismael Mendez-Arroyo
Defendant
Ivette Vazquez-Droz
Defendant
Jaime M. Semiday-Perez
Defendant
James Steele-Torres
Defendant
Jayfrank Quinones-Carrion
Defendant
Jessy J. Melendez-Hernandez
Defendant
Jesus De Jesus-Colon
Defendant
Jesus E. Montalvan-Diaz
Defendant
Jonathan Figueroa-Catinchi
Defendant
Jonathan Perez-Rodriguez
Defendant
Jose A. Fournier-Collazo
Defendant
Jose D. Resto-Figueroa
Defendant
Jose E. Mojica-Robles
Defendant
Jose E. Rivera-Maldonado
Defendant
Jose L. Mendez-De Jesus
Defendant
Jose L. Ortiz-Aguirre
Defendant
Jose L. Soto-Rivera
Defendant
Jose Rosario-Diaz
Defendant
Josue O. Figueroa-Rodriguez
Defendant
Josue Vazquez-Carrasquillo
Defendant
Juan Guadalupe-Delgado
Defendant
Julio Marana
Defendant
Julio N. Matos-Sanchez
Defendant
Kelvin D. Morales-Cintron
Defendant
Kenny O. Pacheco
Defendant
Kernis Rodriguez-Rivera
Defendant
Kevin Castro-Vega
Defendant
Kidanny Figueroa-Osorio
Defendant
Koby
Defendant
Lely
Defendant
Luis E. Espada-Colon
Defendant
Luis E. Guadalupe-Camacho
Defendant
Luis F. Alicea-Colon
Defendant
Luis F. Diaz-Tineo
Defendant
Luis F. Rodriguez-Marquez
Defendant
Luis Martinez-Nieves
Defendant
Luis Yanyore-Pizarro
Defendant
Michael Muniz-Sanchez
Defendant
Michael Rivera-Rodriguez
Defendant
Miguel Vazquez-Martinez
Defendant
Myles J. Roman-Adorno
Defendant
Nariz
Defendant
Negro Steele
Defendant
Nestor R. Concepcion-Rivera
Defendant
Nilda Santiago-Espinosa
Defendant
Orlando J. Santana
Defendant
Orlando Padilla-Ayala
Defendant
Oscar A. Calvino-Acevedo
Defendant
Pedro Vigio-Aponte
Defendant
Pitbull
Defendant
Punky
Defendant
Rafael Hiraldo-Alejandro
Defendant
Rafael Ojeda-Andino
Defendant
Ramon Andino-Peguero
Defendant
Ramon Vicenty-Rivera
Defendant
Reinaldo Rodriguez-Martinez
Defendant
Reyfrank Quinones-Carrion
Defendant
Reynaldo Gonzalez-Zayas
Defendant
Robert D. Perez-Nunez
Defendant
Roberto Fuentes-Pacheco
Defendant
Roger Falu-Diaz
Defendant
Ruben Cotto-Andino
Defendant
Sonata
Defendant
Sonso
Defendant
Sony
Defendant
Tarsis Guillermo Sanchez-Mora
Defendant
Victor Alfonso-Jorge
Defendant
Victor M. Rodriguez-Torres
Defendant
W
Defendant
Walter D. Muller-Colon
Defendant
Wilfredo Ruiz
Defendant
William Ortiz-Aguirre
Defendant
William Zambrana-Sierra
Defendant
Willito
Defendant
Xavier Castro-Vega
Defendant
Yamir Arizmendi-Santana
Interested Party
U.S. Probation
Interested Party
US Probation Office
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Aug 31 2018
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Edgardo R. Ruano-Chevere (70). Objections to R&R due by 9/14/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (cml)
GPO Nov 08 2018
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Kevin Castro-Vega (87). Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 11/1/2018. (jm)
GPO Nov 24 2020
COPY OF OPINION AND ORDER filed in case 17-cv-01603-FAB re 3153 Motion to Vacate (2255) as to Jessy J. Melendez-Hernandez (54). Petitioner Jessy J. Melendez-Hernandez's motion filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 and his Supplemental Motion are DENIED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/24/2020. (ab) Civil Case 3:17-cv-01603-FAB closed.
GPO Dec 19 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Jose E. Mojica-Robles (19). Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 12/19/2023. (CSV)
GPO Dec 27 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Analdi Tanco-Moreno (38): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 1/10/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 12/27/2023. (CSV)
GPO Jan 16 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Orlando Padilla-Ayala (61): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 1/30/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 1/16/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jan 17 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Kernis Rodriguez-Rivera (62): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 1/17/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jan 17 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Alexis Cartagena-Gerena (28): Defendant may be eligible for a sentence reduction. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 1/17/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jan 17 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Tarsis Guillermo Sanchez-Mora (23): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 1/17/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jan 17 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Jesus De Jesus-Colon (31): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 1/17/2024. (CSV)
GPO Feb 15 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Jose D. Resto-Figueroa (60): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 2/29/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 2/15/2024. (CSV)
GPO Feb 15 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Abimael Cruz-Rodriguez (56): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 2/29/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 2/15/2024. (CSV)
GPO Feb 22 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Reinaldo Rodriguez-Martinez (15): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 3/7/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 2/22/2024. (CSV)
GPO Mar 04 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Michael Rivera-Rodriguez (46): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 3/4/2024. (CSV)
GPO Mar 04 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Frankie Rosa-Calderon (3): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 3/4/2024. (CSV)
GPO Mar 05 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Christian Morales-Castro (8): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 3/5/2024. (CSV)
GPO Apr 11 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Amaury Mendez-Rosado (42): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 4/11/2024. (CSV)
GPO Apr 23 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Emmanuel Zavala-Perez (24): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 4/23/2024. (CSV)
GPO May 10 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Christian Vazquez-Hernandez (91): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 5/24/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/10/2024. (CSV)
GPO May 13 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Jose L. Mendez-De Jesus (32): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 5/28/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/13/2024. (CSV)
GPO May 14 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to William Zambrana-Sierra (33): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 5/28/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/14/2024. (CSV)
GPO May 20 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Kidanny Figueroa-Osorio (17): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 6/3/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/20/2024. (CSV)
GPO May 29 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Orlando Padilla-Ayala (61): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 5/29/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jun 28 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Roberto Fuentes-Pacheco (50): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 6/28/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jul 19 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Ernesto Morales-Castro (7): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/19/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jul 29 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Jesus E. Montalvan-Diaz (41): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 8/12/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/29/2024. (CSV)
GPO Aug 01 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Carlos M. Guerrero-Castro (37): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 8/1/2024. (CSV)
GPO Aug 15 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to William Ortiz-Aguirre (16): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 8/15/2024. (CSV)
GPO Aug 15 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Angel L. Soto-Ramos (29): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 8/15/2024. (CSV)
GPO Sep 25 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Rafael Ojeda-Andino (21): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 9/25/2024. (CSV)
GPO Oct 22 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Jose L. Ortiz-Aguirre (14): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 11/6/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/22/2024. (CSV)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.