McDonough v. Miami Dade County
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia G Cooke |
Referred: | Edwin G Torres |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-22787 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 23, 2016 8:06 AM EST |
Defendant
John Does I through X
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Dade County
a political subdivision 111 N.W, First Street
Miami, FL 33128 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.D. Patterson
Director of the Miami-Dade Police Department, in his official capacity 9105 N.W. 25th St.
Doral, FL 33172 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Miami-Dade Police Department Facebook Page Administrator
|
|
Plaintiff
Dr. James Eric McDonough
32320 S.W. 199 Ave.
Homestead, FL 33030 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Tue 10/20 10:47 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL re14 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by J.D. Patterson, Miami-Dade County Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/20/2015. (tm) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/24 11:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Miami-Dade County, J.D. Patterson (Viciana, Ana) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Administrative Order
Tue 08/25 2:16 PM
Order Administratively Closing Case Upon Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/25/2015. (tm) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. |
|
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 08/24 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Miami-Dade County, J.D. Patterson (Viciana, Ana) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 08/18 2:43 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part10 Defendants Miami-Dade County and Director J.D. Patterson's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants Miami-Dade County and Miami-Dade Police Department Director J.D. Patterson shall have through and including August 25, 2015 by which to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/18/2015. (abi) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 08/18 2:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Miami-Dade County, J.D. Patterson. Attorney Ana Angelica Viciana added to party Miami-Dade County(pty:dft), Attorney Ana Angelica Viciana added to party J.D. Patterson(pty:dft).(Viciana, Ana) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 08/14 2:52 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by James Eric McDonough. Miami-Dade County served on 7/28/2015, answer due 8/18/2015; J.D. Patterson served on 7/28/2015, answer due 8/18/2015. (Greenstein, Alan) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Notice of Court Practice
Fri 07/31 10:40 AM
Notice of Court Practice re Joint Motions Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/31/2015. (tm) |
|
7 | 7
utility
Calendar Entry
Fri 07/31 10:39 AM
ORDER EXPEDITING SERVICE. Expedited Service Deadline 9/29/2015. (tm) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Fri 07/31 10:38 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/31/2015. (tm) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Judge
Fri 07/31 10:38 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/31/2015. (tm) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/28 7:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Miami-Dade County, J.D. Patterson. (vjk) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Tue 07/28 7:01 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (vjk) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Tue 07/28 7:01 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (vjk) |
|
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7944335, filed by James Eric McDonough.(Greenstein, Alan) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |