Tennessee Middle District Court
Case #: 2:10-cv-00014
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause09:0009 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2010
Terminated:Jun 02, 2011
Petitioner
Livingston Regional Hospital, LLC
Respondent
Timothy Horsky

GPO Apr 27 2010
ORDER: Petitioner to supplement the record by providing the Court with any agreement between the parties regarding the court where confirmation shouldbe sought and the status of service upon respondent Horsky of thenotice required by 9 U.S.C. § 9. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/27/10. (dt)
GPO Jun 10 2010
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondent is ORDERED to show cause on or before Friday, 6/25/2010, why the arbitration award should not be confirmed as requested in the petition. Respondent is admonished that his failure to respond to this order may cause the undersigned Magistrate Judge to recommend that the arbitration award be confirmed. The Clerk is hereby directed to mail a copy of this order to respondent Horsky at the address appearing in this record: Timothy Horsky, D.O., 3202 Village Road, Orwigsburg, Pennsylvania 17961-9767. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 6/10/10. (xc: Timothy Horsky, D.O., by regular and certified mail)(dt)
GPO Jun 02 2011
ORDER: By Order entered on 6/10/2010 10, the Magistrate Judge orderedRespondent to show cause on or before Friday, 6/25/2010, why the arbitration award should not be confirmed as requested in the petition. Respondent failed to respond as directed. Accordingly, the arbitratIOn award is confirmed and this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/2/11. (dt)
GPO Jun 02 2011
ORDER GRANTING LIVINGSTON REGIONAL HOSPITAL'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD: The PETITION to confirm the arbitration award is hereby GRANTED and JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED as follows: In favor of the petitioner, Livingston Regional Hospital, in the amount of $133,855.31, and against the respondent, Timothy Horsky, D.O., plus judgment in the amount of $41,854.38 in favor of petitioner, Livingston Regional Hospital and against the respondent, Timothy Horsky, D O. A copy of this Order shall be served upon all parties within 7 days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/2/11. (dt)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.