Peerless Eagle Coal Co.
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:15-bk-33896
Lead case is: 3:15-bk-33896
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin R Huennekens |
Case #: | 3:15-bk-34041 |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Peerless Eagle Coal Co.
300 Running Right Way
Julian, WV 25329 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Judy A. Robbins
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Suite 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
court
Case Closed - Chapter 11
Thu 06/28 2:25 PM
Chapter 11 Case Closed (Luedecke, Tammy) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Amended Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s) Filed: Schedule E/F, Schedule G, filed by Jason William Harbour of Hunton & Williams LLP on behalf of Peerless Eagle Coal Co.. (Harbour, Jason) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Statement of Financial Affairs of Peerless Eagle Coal Co. filed by John Ronald Smith of Hunton & Williams on behalf of Peerless Eagle Coal Co.. (Smith, John) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of Peerless Eagle Coal Co. filed by John Ronald Smith of Hunton & Williams on behalf of Peerless Eagle Coal Co.. (Smith, John) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration , Related Case 3:15-bk-33896. An Order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules for United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Virginia directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Alpha Natural Resources, Inc.; Alex Energy, Inc.; Alpha American Coal Company, LLC; Alpha American Coal Holding, LLC; Alpha Appalachia Holdings, Inc.; Alpha Appalachia Services, Inc.; Alpha Coal Resources Company, LLC; Alpha Coal Sales Co., LLC; Alpha Coal West, Inc.; Alpha European Sales, Inc.; Alpha India, LLC; Alpha Land and Reserves, LLC; Alpha Midwest Holding Company; Alpha Natural Resources, LLC; Alpha Natural Resources International, LLC; Alpha Natural Resources Services, LLC; Alpha PA Coal Terminal, LLC; Alpha Shipping and Chartering, LLC; Alpha Sub Eight, LLC; Alpha Sub Eleven, Inc.; Alpha Sub Nine, LLC; Alpha Sub One, LLC; Alpha Sub Ten, Inc.; Alpha Sub Two, LLC; Alpha Terminal Company, LLC; Alpha Wyoming Land Company, LLC; AMFIRE, LLC; AMFIRE Holdings, LLC; AMFIRE Mining Company, LLC; Appalachia Coal Sales Company, Inc.; Appalachia Holding Company; Aracoma Coal Company, Inc.; Axiom Excavating and Grading Services, LLC; Bandmill Coal Corporation; Bandytown Coal Company; Barbara Holdings Inc.; Barnabus Land Company; Belfry Coal Corporation; Big Bear Mining Company; Black Castle Mining Company, Inc.; Black King Mine Development Co.; Black Mountain Cumberland Resources, Inc.; Boone East Development Co.; Brooks Run Mining Company, LLC; Brooks Run South Mining, LLC; Buchanan Energy Company, LLC; Castle Gate Holding Company; Clear Fork Coal Company; Coal Gas Recovery II, LLC; Crystal Fuels Company; Cumberland Coal Resources, LP; Dehue Coal Company; Delbarton Mining Company; Delta Mine Holding Company; DFDSTE Corp.; Dickenson-Russell Coal Company, LLC; Dickenson-Russell Land and Reserves, LLC; DRIH Corporation; Duchess Coal Company; Eagle Energy, Inc.; Elk Run Coal Company, Inc.; Emerald Coal Resources, LP; Enterprise Mining Company, LLC; Esperanza Coal Co., LLC; Foundation Mining, LLC; Foundation PA Coal Company, LLC; Foundation Royalty Company; Freeport Mining, LLC; Freeport Resources Company, LLC; Goals Coal Company; Gray Hawk Insurance Company; Green Valley Coal Company; Greyeagle Coal Company; Harlan Reclamation Services LLC; Herndon Processing Company, LLC; Highland Mining Company; Hopkins Creek Coal Company; Independence Coal Company, Inc.; Jacks Branch Coal Company; Jay Creek Holding, LLC; Kanawha Energy Company; Kepler Processing Company, LLC; Kingston Mining, Inc.; Kingwood Mining Company, LLC; Knox Creek Coal Corporation; Lauren Land Company; Laxare, Inc.; Litwar Processing Company, LLC; Logan County Mine Services, Inc.; Long Fork Coal Company; Lynn Branch Coal Company, Inc.; Maple Meadow Mining Company; Marfork Coal Company, Inc.; Martin County Coal Corporation; Maxxim Rebuild Co., LLC; Maxxim Shared Services, LLC; Maxxum Carbon Resources, LLC; McDowell-Wyoming Coal Company, LLC; Mill Branch Coal Corporation; New Ridge Mining Company; New River Energy Corporation; Neweagle Industries, Inc.; Nicewonder Contracting, Inc.; North Fork Coal Corporation; Omar Mining Company; Paramont Coal Company Virginia, LLC; Paynter Branch Mining, Inc.; Peerless Eagle Coal Co.; Pennsylvania Land Holdings Company, LLC; Pennsylvania Land Resources, LLC; Pennsylvania Land Resources Holding Company, LLC; Pennsylvania Services Corporation; Performance Coal Company; Peter Cave Mining Company; Pigeon Creek Processing Corporation; Pilgrim Mining Company, Inc.; Pioneer Fuel Corporation; Plateau Mining Corporation; Power Mountain Coal Company; Premium Energy, LLC; Rawl Sales & Processing Co.; Republic Energy, Inc.; Resource Development LLC; Resource Land Company LLC; River Processing Corporation; Riverside Energy Company, LLC; Riverton Coal Production Inc.; Road Fork Development Company, Inc.; Robinson-Phillips Coal Company; Rockspring Development, Inc.; Rostraver Energy Company; Rum Creek Coal Sales, Inc.; Russell Fork Coal Company; Shannon-Pocahontas Coal Corporation; Shannon-Pocahontas Mining Company; Sidney Coal Company, Inc.; Spartan Mining Company; Stirrat Coal Company; Sycamore Fuels, Inc.; T. C. H. Coal Co.; Tennessee Consolidated Coal Company; Thunder Mining Company II, Inc.; Trace Creek Coal Company; Twin Star Mining, Inc.; Wabash Mine Holding Company; Warrick Holding Company; West Kentucky Energy Company; White Buck Coal Company; Williams Mountain Coal Company; Wyomac Coal Company, Inc. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Case No. 15-33896 (KRH), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case.(Luedecke, Tammy) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
court
Receipt of Petition Filing Fee
Tue 08/04 6:00 PM
Receipt of Petition Filing Fee. Receipt Number 114778. Fee Amount $1,717.00. (mullert) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Tue 08/04 4:22 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 15-34041 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number Duplicate Receipt, amount $1717.00. (Rabenda) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration with (Motion of the Debtors, Pursuant to Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, for an Order Directing the Joint Administration of their Chapter 11 Cases) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton & Williams on behalf of Peerless Eagle Coal Co.. (Brown, Tyler) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 Filed by John Ronald Smith of Hunton & Williams on behalf of Peerless Eagle Coal Co.. (Smith, John) |