Pentagon Federal Credit Union v. Bramowicz et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-90106
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-90106
Illinois Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mary P Gorman |
Case #: | 2:15-ap-09029 |
Nature of Suit | 41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e) 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Eric Steven Bramowicz
3908 Balmoral Drive
Champaign, IL 61822 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deborah Ann Bramowicz
3908 Balmoral Drive
Champaign, IL 61822 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pentagon Federal Credit Union
Box 1432
Alexandria, VA 22313 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM CDT |
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 02/22 10:30 AM
Adversary Case 2:15-ap-9029 Closed (court, dphi) |
||
Sunday, February 07, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 02/07 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/07/2016. (Admin.) |
|
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 02/07 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/07/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 02/05 12:47 PM
Order Re: . (court, dphi) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 02/05 12:03 PM
Order Re: . (court, dphi) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 02/05 12:51 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:15-ap-9029 Judgment For Plaintiff as to Count II of the Complaint Close Adversary: 2/19/2016. (court, dphi) |
||
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 01/14 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/13/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
crtntc
Cancellation of Hearing Notice
Mon 01/11 12:06 PM
Court Notice re Cancellation of Hearing (court, dphi) |
|
Sunday, January 10, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Response (Other than Motions)
Sun 01/10 9:58 PM
Response Filed by Mark G Meyers of Blitt and Gaines, P.C. on behalf of Pentagon Federal Credit Union . (Meyers, Mark) |
|
Saturday, January 09, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 01/09 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/09/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 01/07 2:51 PM
Order Re: . (court, ephi) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Brief/Memorandum of Law
Thu 01/07 3:52 AM
Brief Filed by Mark G Meyers of Blitt and Gaines, P.C. on behalf of Pentagon Federal Credit Union . (Meyers, Mark) |
|
Saturday, December 05, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 12/06 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/05/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Setting Hearing
Thu 12/03 9:27 AM
Order Setting Hearing . Hearing to be held on 1/13/2016 at 10:30 AM Courtroom C, 1st Floor - Urbana, IL for19 and for11 and for20 and for12 and for1 , (court, ephi) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Thu 12/03 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/02/2015. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Wed 12/02 4:01 PM
Hearing Held Hearing held deadline set: 1/6/2016. (court, ephi) |
|
22 | 22
audio
Wed 12/02 1:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/2/2015 10:10:19 AM ]. File Size [ 3983 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:04 ]. (Kevin Schneider aty defendant Eric and Deborah Bramowicz, Mark Meyers aty plaintiff Pentagon Federal Credit Union, Brett Kepley aty Batura). (admin) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
court
Hearing Set (Motion)
Mon 11/30 1:58 PM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 12/2/2015 at 10:00 AM Courtroom C, 1st Floor - Urbana, IL for19 and for20 , (court, ephi) |
|
Friday, November 27, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Entry of Agreed Order/Judgment
Fri 11/27 3:26 PM
Motion for Entry of Agreed Order/Judgment 523(a)(2) Filed by Kevin Robert Schneider of Hatch Law Firm, P.C., Mark G Meyers of Blitt and Gaines, P.C. on behalf of Pentagon Federal Credit Union (Meyers, Mark) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw Document
Fri 11/27 3:23 PM
Agreed Motion to Withdraw Document Filed by Kevin Robert Schneider of Hatch Law Firm, P.C., Mark G Meyers of Blitt and Gaines, P.C. on behalf of Deborah Ann Bramowicz (Meyers, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
court
Oral Hearing
Wed 11/04 3:41 PM
Oral Notice of Hearing Continued Hearing to be held on 12/2/2015 at 10:00 AM Courtroom C, 1st Floor - Urbana, IL for11 and for12 and for1 , (court, dphi) |
|
17 | 17
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Wed 11/04 3:40 PM
Hearing Held (court, dphi) |
|
16 | 16
audio
Wed 11/04 12:40 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/4/2015 10:40:11 AM ]. File Size [ 993 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:45 ]. (Mark Meyers-pl, Kevin Schneider-db/dft, Brett Kepley-creditors Batura). (admin) |
|
15 | 15
audio
Wed 11/04 12:40 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/4/2015 10:27:47 AM ]. File Size [ 1667 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:38 ]. (Mark Meyers-pl, Kevin Schneider-db/dft, Brett Kepley-creditors Batura). (admin) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Sat 10/31 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/30/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
court
Hearing Set (Motion)
Wed 10/28 9:18 AM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 11/4/2015 at 10:00 AM Courtroom C, 1st Floor - Urbana, IL for11 and for12 , (court, dphi) |
|
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 10/27 3:58 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Count I (11 U.S.C. 727(d)) only Filed by Mark G Meyers of Blitt and Gaines, P.C. on behalf of Pentagon Federal Credit Union (Meyers, Mark) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Entry of Agreed Order/Judgment
Tue 10/27 3:56 PM
Agreed Motion for Entry of Agreed Order/Judgment for PFCU against Deborah Bramowicz Filed by Kevin Robert Schneider of Hatch Law Firm, P.C., Mark G Meyers of Blitt and Gaines, P.C. on behalf of Deborah Ann Bramowicz, Pentagon Federal Credit Union (Meyers, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/03 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/02/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Pre-Trial Adversary Hearing Notice and Pre-Trial Order
Mon 08/31 9:55 AM
Pre-Trial Adversary Hearing Notice and PreTrial Order . Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/4/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom C, 1st Floor - Urbana, IL. (court, dphi) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Response (Other than Motions)
Fri 08/28 4:34 PM
Response Filed by Kevin Robert Schneider of Hatch Law Firm, P.C. on behalf of Deborah Ann Bramowicz, Eric Steven Bramowicz . (Schneider, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Verification | ||
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/25 3:41 PM
Certificate of Service Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Mark G Meyers of Blitt and Gaines, P.C. on behalf of Pentagon Federal Credit Union . (Meyers, Mark) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure of Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 08/25 3:34 PM
Disclosure of Corporate Ownership Statement. Corporate parents added to case: Pentagon Federal Credit Union. Filed by Mark G Meyers of Blitt and Gaines, P.C. on behalf of Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (Meyers, Mark) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 08/03 2:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on Deborah Ann Bramowicz 8/1/2015 (Meyers, Mark) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 08/03 2:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on Eric Steven Bramowicz 8/1/2015 (Meyers, Mark) |
|
Sunday, August 02, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/02 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/02/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Fri 07/31 3:41 PM
Summons Issued on Deborah Ann Bramowicz Answer Due 08/30/2015; Eric Steven Bramowicz Answer Due 08/30/2015 (court, ephi) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/31 3:14 PM
Adversary case 15-09029 (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))): Complaint by Pentagon Federal Credit Union against Eric Steven Bramowicz, Deborah Ann Bramowicz (Meyers, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 07/31 4:19 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-09029 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 8931942. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |