Member Case
Lead case is: 1:12-bk-10202

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Allan L Gropper
Case #: 1:12-bk-10212
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2012
Terminated:Dec 23, 2014

Debtor
Kodak Portuguesa Limited
343 State St
Rochester, NY 14650-0001
Represented By
Andrew G. Dietderich
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent
Attn: James Le 2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 02/09/2013 10:35 PM EST
Thursday, January 19, 2012
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-10212 [misc,824] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 8223532. Fee amount 1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Judge Allan L. Gropper added to the case. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Andrew G. Dietderich of Sullivan & Cromwell LLP on behalf of Kodak Portuguesa Limited. (Dietderich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Andrew G. Dietderich on behalf of Kodak Portuguesa Limited. (Dietderich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 Order signed on 1/19/2012 Authorizing The Joint Administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Eastman Kodak Company; Creo Manufacturing America LLC; Eastman Kodak International Capital Company, Inc.; Far East Development Ltd.; FPC Inc.; Kodak (Near East), Inc.;Kodak Americas, Ltd.; Kodak Aviation Leasing LLC;Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.; Kodak Philippines, Ltd.;Kodak Portuguesa Limited; Kodak Realty, Inc.; Laser-Pacific Media Corporation; NPEC Inc.; Pakon, Inc.; Qualex Inc.; and all further pleadings and other papers shall be filedin, and all further docket entries shall be made in, Case No. 12-10202 Related [+] (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-] 2