Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan R Bolton
Case #: 2:10-cv-00448
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2010
Terminated:May 01, 2014
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2015 9:49 AM MST
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Defendant
Veritest International Corporation
Represented By
Julie Ashworth LaFave
Jennings Strouss & Salmon PLC
contact info
James O Ehinger
Ryley Carlock & Applewhite PA
contact info
Plaintiff
AZR LLC
Represented By
Eric Edward Lynch
Polsinelli Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Steven D Pearson
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
James Joseph Farley, II
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Brian J Williams
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Bruce Robert Meckler
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Michael Louis Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Deborah Tamara Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Doolittle Family Trust
Represented By
Eric Edward Lynch
Polsinelli Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Steven D Pearson
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
James Joseph Farley, II
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Brian J Williams
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Bruce Robert Meckler
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Michael Louis Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Deborah Tamara Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Garmon GST Trust
Represented By
Eric Edward Lynch
Polsinelli Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Steven D Pearson
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
James Joseph Farley, II
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Brian J Williams
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Bruce Robert Meckler
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Michael Louis Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Deborah Tamara Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Tabet
Represented By
Eric Edward Lynch
Polsinelli Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Steven D Pearson
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
James Joseph Farley, II
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Brian J Williams
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Bruce Robert Meckler
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Michael Louis Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Deborah Tamara Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Frank Thomas
a male resident of the State of Arizona 6909 E Montreal Pl.
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85254
Represented By
Michael Louis Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Deborah Tamara Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vaught Limited Family Partnership
Represented By
Eric Edward Lynch
Polsinelli Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Steven D Pearson
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
James Joseph Farley, II
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Scottsdale, Az
contact info
Brian J Williams
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Bruce Robert Meckler
Meckler Bulger Tilson Marick & Pearson Llp - Chicago, Il
contact info
Michael Louis Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
Deborah Tamara Simes
Simes Partners PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Diana Boatwright
Terminated: 08/24/2010
Represented By
Timothy J Thomason
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Michael Joseph Plati
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Stephen R Boatwright
Terminated: 04/26/2011
Represented By
Timothy J Thomason
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Michael Joseph Plati
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Keller Rohrback PLC
Terminated: 04/26/2011
Represented By
Timothy J Thomason
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Michael Joseph Plati
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info



Create an account to get the full docket for this case.