California Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:10-cv-00509
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2010
Terminated:Mar 08, 2011
Defendant
Central Mortgage Company
Defendant
Downey Savings and Loan Association, F.A.
Plaintiff
Chae Chon
Plaintiff
Yung Chon

GPO Aug 20 2010
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/20/10 ORDERING that dft's 11 Motion to Dismiss plf's complaint is GRANTED w/leave to amend. Dft's motion to Expunge the Lis Pendens is DENIED. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint not later than 20 days after the date this Memorandum and Order is filed electronically. If no amended complaint is filed w/i said 20-day period, without further notice, plfs' claims will be dismissed without leave to amend. (Benson, A.)
GPO Dec 08 2010
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/7/2010 ORDERING that Dft's 18 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Pltfs TILA claim is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Pltfs may file an amended complaint as to their remaining causes of action within 20 days. (Zignago, K.)
GPO Mar 08 2011
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/7/11 ORDERING the Court remands the case to Superior Court of the State of California, County of Sacramento. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 26 is DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Copy of remand order sent to Superior Court. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.