Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:David R Herndon
Referred: Philip M Frazier
Case #: 3:10-cv-10469
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2010
Terminated:Jan 22, 2014
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2015 9:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Prentiss W. Hallenbeck, Jr.
Ulmer & Berne Llp - Cincinnati
contact info
Joseph P. Thomas
Ulmer & Berne Llp - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Defendant
Berlex, Inc.
Defendant
Berlex Laboratories International, Inc.
Defendant
Bayer Schering Pharma AG
Represented By
Adam L. Hoeflich
Bartlit, Beck Et Al.
contact info
John E. Galvin
Fox Galvin LLC
contact info
Terry Lueckenhoff
Fox Galvin, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare, LLC
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
a Delaware corporation c/o CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company 221 Bolivar
Jefferson City, MO 65101
Represented By
Adam L. Hoeflich
Bartlit, Beck Et Al.
contact info
John E. Galvin
Fox Galvin LLC
contact info
Terry Lueckenhoff
Fox Galvin, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
Defendant
Bayer AG
Defendant
Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By
Prentiss W. Hallenbeck, Jr.
Ulmer & Berne Llp - Cincinnati
contact info
Joseph P. Thomas
Ulmer & Berne Llp - Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By
Prentiss W. Hallenbeck, Jr.
Ulmer & Berne Llp - Cincinnati
contact info
Joseph P. Thomas
Ulmer & Berne Llp - Cincinnati
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie Recene
Represented By
Michael A. London
Douglas & London PC
contact info
Takeena M. Thompson
Cohen & Malad, LLP
contact info
Roger C. Denton
Schlichter, Bogard Et Al. - St. Louis
contact info
Gregory L. Laker
Cohen & Malad, LLP
contact info
Michael S. Burg
Burg Simpson Eldridge Et Al
contact info
Mark R. Niemeyer
Niemeyer, Grebel & Kruse LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Recene
Represented By
Michael A. London
Douglas & London PC
contact info
Takeena M. Thompson
Cohen & Malad, LLP
contact info
Roger C. Denton
Schlichter, Bogard Et Al. - St. Louis
contact info
Gregory L. Laker
Cohen & Malad, LLP
contact info
Michael S. Burg
Burg Simpson Eldridge Et Al
contact info
Mark R. Niemeyer
Niemeyer, Grebel & Kruse LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 19 2013
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NUMBER 60, Settlement Agreement and Deadlines - Gallbladder Injuries. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 3/15/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Signed Settlement Agreement), # (2) Exhibit B (Notice of Intent to Opt Out Form - Appendix B-1), # (3) Exhibit C (Notice of Intent to Opt In Form - Appendix B-2), # (4) Exhibit D (Declaration - Appendix G))(dsw)
GPO Jan 22 2014
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 1/22/2014. (slj)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.