West v. eHarmony, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Pauley, III |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-06080 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12188 Americans With Disabilities Act - Civil Enforcement Actions |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 30, 2016 11:05 AM EST |
Defendant
eHarmony, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Mary West
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 11/19 9:48 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and their respective counsel that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, against the defendant eHarmony, Inc. pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with the parties to bear responsibility for their respective costs and fees. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/18/2015) (rjm) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 11/16 3:53 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) eHarmony, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Mary West(on behalf of herself ).(Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 10/26 10:05 AM
ORDER granting10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from C.K. Lee dated October 21, 2015. Document filed by Mary West (on behalf of herself). Application granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/26/2015) (rjm) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 10/21 1:26 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from C.K. Lee dated October 21, 2015. Document filed by Mary West(on behalf of herself ).(Lee, C.K.) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 10/08 8:55 AM
ORDER granting8 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from C.K. Lee dated October 7, 2015. Document filed by Mary West (on behalf of herself). Application granted. The parties shall file a joint status report by 10/21/15 if no stipulation of settlement has been filed on the docket by that date. The following deadline(s) was terminated: Initial Conference, Answer Due Date. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/7/2015) (rjm) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 10/07 2:14 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from C.K. Lee dated October 7, 2015. Document filed by Mary West(on behalf of herself ).(Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/15 9:10 AM
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter is hereby extended through and including October 26, 2015. There has been no previous request for an extension of time. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that Defendant also agrees to (i) waive all defenses to invalid service of process and (ii) accept service of the Complaint and all amendments thereon. SO ORDERED. eHarmony, Inc. answer due 10/26/2015. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/14/2015) (kko) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/08 3:28 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. eHarmony, Inc. served on 8/19/2015, answer due 9/9/2015. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougerty, Legal Clerk (Secretary of State). Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mary West(on behalf of herself ). (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 08/12 9:57 AM
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 8/11/2015) (ajs) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/04 9:17 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to eHarmony, Inc.. (ky) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 08/04 9:13 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (ky) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 08/04 9:14 AM
Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (ky) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 08/04 9:15 AM
Case Designated ECF. (ky) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Tue 08/04 10:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney C.K. Lee re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; party/parties must be added separately as individuals ans in their official capacities. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (ky) |
||
utility
Add Party for Pleading
Tue 08/04 11:33 AM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Party Mary West added.Party added pursuant to1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary West. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Mary West.(Lee, C.K.) |
||
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 08/03 4:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to eHarmony, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary West. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 08/03 4:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/03 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against eHarmony, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11230809)Document filed by Mary West.(Lee, C.K.) |