Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joan N Feeney
Case #: 1:05-bk-10787
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2005
Creditor Meeting:Mar 21, 2005
Terminated:Mar 30, 2012
Plan Confirmed:Jul 10, 2006

Debtor
High Voltage Engineering Corporation
500 Hunt Valley Drive
New Kensington, PA 15068
Represented By
High Voltage Engineering Corporation
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Paula R.C. Bachtell
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Steven B. Levine
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Ira M. Levee
Lowenstein Sandler PC
contact info
Creditor Committee Chair
John C Hindle, III
Hitran Corporation 362 Highway 31
Flemington, NJ 08822
Trustee
Stephen S. Gray, Liquidating Trustee of HVE Liquidating Trust, Stephen S. Gray, Liquidating Trustee of High Voltage Engineering Liquidating Trust
270 Congress Street
Boston, MA 02210
Represented By
George W. Tetler, III
Bowditch & Dewey
contact info
Mark W. Powers
Bowditch & Dewey
contact info

GPO Jan 19 2007
Opinion Issued by Judge Joan N. Feeney Dated 1/19/07 (Re: 1420 Motion filed by Trustee Stephen S. Gray To Vacate (I) Orders of Court and (II) Reconsider Administrative Expense Claims of Professionals). CONCLUSION: FOR THE REASON SET FORTH ABOVE, AS WELL AS FOR REASONS SET FORTH IN THE OPPOSITIONS OF THE 2004 PROFESSIONALS INCORPORATED BY REFERENCE, THE COURT SHALL ENTER AN ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO VACATE. THE COURT CONCLUDES THAT THE DEFENSES ANALYZED HEREIN COMPEL DISALLOWANCE OF THE MOTION TO VACATE AND A DISCUSSION OF THE OTHER DEFENSES RAISED BY THE 2004 PROFESSIONALS IS UNNECESSARY AND WOULD SERVE NO USEFUL PURPOSE. (fac, usbc)
GPO Jan 19 2007
Opinion Issued by Judge Joan N. Feeney Dated 1/19/07 (Re: 2149 Motion filed by Trustee Stephen S. Gray, Liquidating Trustee of HVE Liquidating Trust For An Order Pursuant To Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) Approving Compromise and Settlement With Goulston and Storrs, P.C.(Re: 1420 Motion to Vacate)). THE COURT HEREBY OVERRULES THE LIMITED OBJECTION FILED BY FRIED FRANK AND GRANTS THE SETTLEMENT MOTION. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE LIQUIDATING TRUSTEE HAS SATISFIED HIS BURDEN UNDER FED.R.BANKR.P. 9019(a) AND JEFFREY v. DESMOND, 70 F.3d 183, 185 (1st Cir. 1995). THE COURT FURTHER FINDS, BASED UPON THE UNCONTESTED AFFIDAVIT OF RICHARD M. ZIELINSKI, A DIRECTOR OF GOULSTON & STORRS, P.C., AND DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. VENDITTO, COUNSEL TO THE LIQUIDATING TRUSTEE, THAT THE SETTLEMENT WAS THE RESULT OF GOOD FAITH NEGOTIATIONS AND WAS ENTERED INTO IN GOOD FAITH. THE COURT SHALL ENTER THE ORDER ATTACHED TO THE SETTLEMENT MOTION. (fac, usbc)
GPO Nov 07 2008
Feeney, J. Memorandum Dated 11/7/08 (Re: 2675 Motion filed by Liquidator Stephen S. Gray, Liquidating Supervisor of HVE For Order (A) Authorizing the Abandonment to the New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection of the Debtors' Contingent Interest in Certain Funds Held in Trust and (B) Relieving the Liquidating Supervisor from Any Further Obligations with Respect to Certain Real Property Located in New Jersey, 2884 Motion filed by Liquidator Stephen S. Gray, Liquidating Supervisor of HVE For Authority (Re: 2882 Settlement Agreement, 2883 Settlement Agreement) to Cause Debtors to Enter into Settlement Agreement with Raymond Mellen, Jeanne Mellen and the State of New Jersey, 2882 Settlement Agreement filed by Stephen S. Gray, Liquidating Trustee of HVE Liquidating Trust, 2883 Settlement Agreement filed by Stephen S. Gray, Liquidating Supervisor of HVE, 2922 Opposition filed by Interested Party Mellen Pride Sales Company, Inc.). IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOREGOING, AND TREATING THE ABANDONMENT MOTION, THE SETTLEMENT MOTION AND MELLEN PRIDE'S OBJECTION TO THE SETTLEMENT MOTION AS CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, THE COURT SHALL ENTER ORDERS OVERRULING THE OBJECTION OF MELLEN PRIDE, GRANTING THE SETTLEMENT MOTION, AND DENYING THE ABANDONMENT MOTION. See Memorandum For Full Text. (fac, USBC) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Added Linkage To Related Document 2675. Modified on 11/7/2008 (fac, USBC).

Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
3111 3111 order Order Tue 06/30 8:32 AM
Order Regarding Documents Filed Under Seal RE:3110 Notice re: Impounded Documents re: #734 Spreadsheet of Proposed Retention Bonuses to Employees Eligible to Participate in the Robicon Retention Bonus Plan and #966 Schedule of Key Employees and Retention Bonuses under Key Employee Retention Plan for Certain Employees of High Voltage Engineering Corporation. (rmb)
Related: [-]