Honaker v. Sheffield et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Mary S Scriven |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Jenkins |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01797 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2015 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 02, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order dismissing case
Wed 12/02 4:59 PM
ORDER dismissing without prejudice case for failure to respond to 10 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The CLERK is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/2/2015. (RO) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on motion for leave to proceed In forma pauperis
Wed 09/16 10:30 AM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, however, within thirty (30) days Honaker must pay $15 as an initial installment as provided in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1)(A). The CLERK is directed to mail a copy of this order and the prisoner consent form (Doc. 9) to the Florida Department of Corrections, Inmate Trust Fund, Centerville Station, P.O. Box 12100, Tallahassee, FL 32317-2100, Attention: Jeffrey R. Straley, Professional Account Supervisor, and Veronica Wold, Government Operations Consultant. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/16/2015. (RO) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Prisoner consent form and financial certificate
Mon 09/14 2:26 PM
PRISONER consent form and financial certificate by Chase A. Honaker. (BES) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Mon 08/24 3:49 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chase A. Honaker. Related case(s): no (BES) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order to file proof of indigency
Thu 08/13 10:23 AM
ORDER to pay the filing fee or to file proof of indigency, which is due by 9/14/2015. The CLERK is directed to send a "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form to Honaker. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/13/2015. (RO) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Fri 08/07 9:56 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/21/2015. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/7/2015. (APV) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/05 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Intent to Sue by Chase A. Honaker (LSS) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 08/05 10:07 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chase A. Honaker. (LSS) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of indigency
Wed 08/05 10:06 AM
AFFIDAVIT of indigency by Chase A. Honaker. (LSS) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/05 10:05 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chase A. Honaker. (LSS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/05 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chase A. Honaker.(LSS) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope |