New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:15-cv-06153
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause18:981 Civil Forfeiture
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2015
Terminated:Jan 19, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 03, 2016 8:09 AM EST
Defendant-in-Rem
One 2006 Load rite trailer, Model no. WV1003W, VIN 5A4JVSJ1462019837,
Defendant-in-Rem
Various pieces of jewelry,
Defendant-in-Rem
The real property and appurtenances known as condominium unit 302, 264 montgomery a venue, Haverford, Pennsylvania, 19041, together with its appurtenances, improvements, fixtures and accompanying righ
Defendant-in-Rem
The real property and appurtenances known as 1400 mountain top road, Bridgewater, New Jersey, 08807
Defendant-in-Rem
One white 2005 Yamaha raptor 660 four-wheel ATV, series YFM660RTW, VIN JY4AM01Y15C071791,
Defendant-in-Rem
One sharp television mounted on the wall in the living room of condominium unit 302, 264 Montgomery avenue, Haverford, Pennsylvania 19041, and all its parts and accessories, including remote control(s
Defendant-in-Rem
One razor punk 360 mini bike, serial no. K0200119,
Defendant-in-Rem
One go-ped motorized scooter, serial no. BF-28851,
Defendant-in-Rem
One desktop cpu, monitor, peripherals and accessories
Defendant-in-Rem
One White 2005 Yamaha Raptor 350 four-wheel ATV, series YFM350RTW, VIN JY4AH12Y95C012304,
Defendant-in-Rem
One Red lil Indian mini bike, model no. HH60,
Defendant-in-Rem
One Arians snow blower, model no. 1128, serial no. 018395,
Defendant-in-Rem
One 2008 Honda CRF250R8 Motocross off-road motorcycle, VIN JH2ME10398M400640,
Defendant-in-Rem
One 2007 Dodge Ram 1500 Pickup Truck, VIN 1D7HU18237J612898, New Jersey Registration number YXF 95U, together with its fixtures, electronics, equipment, parts and accessories
Defendant-in-Rem
THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS 1400 MOUNTAIN TOP ROAD,BRIDGEWATER, NEW JERSEY, 08807, TOGETHER WITH ITS APPURTENANCES, IMPROVEMENTS AND FIXTURES (INDOOR AND OUTDOOR) , MORE PARTICULARLY
Defendant-in-Rem
One 2006 Kawasaki Jet Ski STX-15F, Model JT1500A6F,
Defendant-in-Rem
One 2005 Karavan Boat trailer, model no. BW-2350-74-ST, VIN 5KTBS 19115F000821 05,
Defendant-in-Rem
One 2005 17' Boston Whaler Ser No: US-BWCE9 672H4 05,
Defendant-in-Rem
One 2004 Nissan Pathfinder LE Edition, vehicle identification number (VIN) JN8DR09Y34 W915819, together with its fixtures, electronics, equipment, parts and accessories
Defendant-in-Rem
One 2001 Blue Yamaha TT-R 125 off-road motorcycle, series E809E-012618, VIN NACEOY314017442,
Defendant-in-Rem
Chase bank cashier's check no. 09821713556 made payable to the United States Marshals Service dates 12/29/2009 in the amount of $504,459.76 remitter Joanne Dipascali,
Defendant-in-Rem
Approximately $84,160 held by Bracewell & Giulliani LLP on account for Frank Dipascali Jr.,
Defendant-in-Rem
Any and all tax refunds paid to Frank Dipascali Jr., and/or Joanne T. Dipascali attributable to assets and liabilities incurred through calendar year 2009
Defendant-in-Rem
Any and all securities shares, cash and other property on deposit in any and all accounts held at fidelity investments in the name of Frank Dipascali, Jr. or Joanne T. Dipascali, including, but not li
Defendant-in-Rem
All valuable, insured or readily salable personal property (including indoor and outdoor appliances, electronics, fixtures, and furnishings) located at 1400 Mountain top road, Bridgewater, New Jersey,
Defendant-in-Rem
All funds, financial instruments and other property on deposit in any and all accountsat somerset savings bank held in the name of Frank Dipascali, Jr or Joanne T. Dispascali
Plaintiff
United States Of America
United States of America Niketh V. Velamoor One Saint Andrews Plaza
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Jonathan Ephraim Weis Cohen
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
Niketh Varadaraj Velamoor
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
14 14 order Judgment - Default ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 01/19 5:20 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff United States of America shall have judgment by default against the Defendants in rem. 2. The Defendants in rem be, and the same hereby is, forfeited to plaintiff United States of America. 3. The United States Marshals (or its designee) shall dispose of the Defendants in rem, according to law. (As further set forth in this Judgment.) Motions terminated:12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Real Property and Appurtenances known as 1400 Mountain Top Road, Bridgewater, New Jersey, et al filed by United States Of America. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/19/2016)(kko)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Right to Appeal,
Att: 2 Right to Appeal
Thursday, January 14, 2016
13 13 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 01/14 4:23 PM
DECLARATION of AUSA Niketh Velamoor in Support re:12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Real Property and Appurtenances known as 1400 Mountain Top Road, Bridgewater, New Jersey, et al .. Document filed by United States Of America.(Velamoor, Niketh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
12 12 motion Default Judgment Thu 01/14 4:20 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Real Property and Appurtenances known as 1400 Mountain Top Road, Bridgewater, New Jersey, et al . Document filed by United States Of America.(Velamoor, Niketh)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Clerk Thu 01/14 3:39 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to all Defendants. (km)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service by Publication Thu 01/14 11:42 AM
SERVICE BY PUBLICATION. A Notice of Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on August 28, 2015 through September 26, 2015. Document filed by United States Of America. (Velamoor, Niketh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Thu 12/03 5:11 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The government may proceed with its default judgment motion practice. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/3/2015) (spo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2015
8 8 motion Leave to File Document Wed 12/02 7:27 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Default Judgment addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 12/02/15. Document filed by United States Of America.(Cohen, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2015
7 7 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 11/12 3:51 PM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to control date of February 10, 2016, at 10:00 AM. (Initial Conference set for 2/10/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/12/2015) (spo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2015
6 6 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 11/10 6:55 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 11/10/2015. Document filed by United States Of America.(Cohen, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/02 7:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Ephraim Weis Cohen on behalf of United States Of America. (Cohen, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
4 4 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 08/21 3:09 PM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/12/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/21/2015) (ajs)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2015
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Fri 08/07 7:17 AM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 10-cv-04858 (LTS). Document filed by United States Of America.(Velamoor, Niketh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Fri 08/07 2:57 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:10-cv-04858-LTS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Fri 08/07 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 08/07 2:58 PM
Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (pgu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2015
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 08/06 9:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Niketh Varadaraj Velamoor re: Document No. 1 Complaint for Forfeiture,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (ky)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 08/06 9:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Niketh Varadaraj Velamoor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS 1400 MOUNTAIN TOP ROAD,BRIDGEWATER, NEW JERSEY, 08807, TOGETHER WITH ITS APPURTENANCES, IMPROVEMENTS AND FIXTURES (INDOOR AND OUTDOOR), MORE PARTICULARLY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (ky)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Related Case Statement Thu 08/06 9:16 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Niketh Varadaraj Velamoor, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (ky)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 08/06 9:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (ky)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Thu 08/06 9:19 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Laura Taylor Swain as possibly related to 10-cv-4858. (ky)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/06 9:20 AM
Case Designated ECF. (ky)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Thu 08/06 11:41 AM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Party The real property and appurtenances known as 1400 mountain top road, Bridgewater, New Jersey, 08807 added.Party added pursuant to1 Complaint for Forfeiture,. Document filed by The real property and appurtenances known as 1400 mountain top road, Bridgewater, New Jersey, 08807. Related document:1 Complaint for Forfeiture, filed by United States Of America.(Velamoor, Niketh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 08/05 5:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Velamoor, Niketh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint for Forfeiture Wed 08/05 5:54 PM
COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS 1400 MOUNTAIN TOP ROAD,BRIDGEWATER, NEW JERSEY, 08807, TOGETHER WITH ITS APPURTENANCES, IMPROVEMENTS AND FIXTURES (INDOOR AND OUTDOOR), MORE PARTICULARLY.Document filed by United States Of America.(Velamoor, Niketh)
Related: [-]