Joseph Weinberg v. Valeant Pharmaceuticals International et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Karen E Scott |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01260 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 08, 2017 12:50 PM PDT |
Defendant
Valeant Pharmaceuticals International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Weinberg
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation
Terminated: 11/04/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bausch and Lomb Incorporated
Terminated: 11/04/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Obagi Medical Products Inc
Terminated: 11/04/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
92 | 92
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 05/03 4:44 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals77 , CCA # 17-56359 The judgment of this Court, entered April 11, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum91 AFFIRMED.] (mat) |