Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Lynch
Case #: 3:05-bk-70657
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2005
Creditor Meeting:Apr 01, 2005
Claims Deadline:Feb 15, 2007
Terminated:Aug 21, 2020
Plan Confirmed:May 28, 2009

Debtor
Tan Books and Publishers Inc
2020 Harrison Ave
Rockford, IL 61104
Represented By
Tyler A Moore
contact info
Kenneth F. Ritz, ESQ
Ritz & Laughlin, Ltd. P.C.
contact info
Thomas E. Laughlin
Attorney Thomas E. Laughlin
contact info
George P Hampilos
Schirger, Monteleone, Hampilos
contact info
Ronald Peterson
Jenner & Block
contact info
Last checked: never
Counter-Claimant
Gardner Brothers, Objector
Represented By
Tyler A Moore
contact info
Counter-Defendant
Tan Books and Publishers Inc
2020 Harrison Ave
Rockford, IL 61104
Creditor Committee
Creditors' Committee
555 Skokie Blvd Suite 500
Northbrook, IL 60062
Represented By
David Larsen
contact info
William S Hackney, III
Smithamundsen, LLC
contact info
Louis W Levit, ESQ
contact info
Brian M. Graham
contact info
Ean L Kryska
Abm Industries, Inc.
contact info
Trustee
Fred Caruso
70 W Madison St Ste 2300
Chicago, IL 60602
Represented By
John F. Pollick
John F. Pollick, P.C.
contact info
Richard J Mason
Mcguire Woods, LLP
contact info
Patricia K. Smoots
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
McGuire Woods LLP
contact info
Paul Catanese
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Michael M Schmahl
Pollick & Schmahl, LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 780 Regent Street Suite 304
Madison, WI 53715
Represented By
Sheree G Dandurand
Office Of U S Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Friday, August 21, 2020
1356 1356 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 08/21 8:49 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed . (Krystavel, Kara)
Related: [-]
1355 1355 order Generic Order Fri 08/21 8:49 AM
Order Granting - Order Closing Case Related [+]. Signed on 8/21/2020 (Krystavel, Kara)
Related: [-] 1329 Motion to Approve,1333 Order Vacating Order, Reopen Case, Order Scheduling
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
1354 1354 misc Proposed Order Wed 08/19 5:48 PM
Proposed Order - Order Closing Case Filed by Mary A Shipley on behalf of Fred Caruso Related [+]. (Shipley, Mary)
Related: [-] 1007 Modified Chapter 11 Plan,1231 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan,1329 Motion to Approve,1337 Amended/Corrected Order, Order Scheduling,1343 Report,1346 Order (Generic),1352 Report