District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Christopher R Cooper
Case #: 1:15-cv-01270
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2015
Terminated:Apr 14, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2016 7:45 AM EST
Defendant
JENNIFER SHASKY CALVERY
Represented By
Amy E. Powell
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Lynn Yuhee Lee
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Represented By
Amy E. Powell
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Lynn Yuhee Lee
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
FINANCIAL CRIMES ENFORCEMENT NETWORK
Represented By
Amy E. Powell
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Lynn Yuhee Lee
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
JACOB J. LEW
Represented By
Amy E. Powell
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Lynn Yuhee Lee
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
FBME Bank LTD.
Represented By
Derek Lawrence Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FBME LTD.
Represented By
Derek Lawrence Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FBME BANK LTD.
Represented By
Derek Lawrence Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 27 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/27/2015. (lccrc3) .
GPO Nov 06 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 38 Motion to Remand: It is hereby ORDERED that 38 FinCEN's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, no later than November 30, 2015, FinCEN will publish notice of its intent to reopen the Final Rule and provide relevant unclassified materials to plaintiffs and the public. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for comments on the reopened Final Rule shall be set for no later than two months following FinCEN's notice of intent to reopen the Final Rule. It is further ORDERED that, no later than two months following the deadline for comments, FinCEN will render a decision on the reopened Final Rule. It is further ORDERED that, no later than two weeks after FinCEN renders a decision on the reopened Final Rule, the parties shall meet and confer and submit to the Court a joint status report. It is further ORDERED that this action be STAYED pending completion of the remand proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/6/2015. (lccrc3)
GPO Sep 20 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 61 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; 62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; 64 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Supplement the Administrative Record; 72 Plaintiffs' Motion to Cross-Examine or Depose Richard May. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/20/2016. (lccrc1)
GPO Apr 14 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 88 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; 89 Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; 92 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/14/2017. (lccrc1)

Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 08, 2017
109 109 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 11/08 3:53 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to106 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by FBME LTD., FBME BANK LTD. ; USCA Case Number 17-5076 (td)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA Judgment