ZLOOP, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Karen B Owens |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-11660 |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Oct 14, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 09, 2022 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 25, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
ZLOOP, Inc.
816 13th St NE
Hickory, NC 28601-4133 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |