Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:15-bk-43239
Lead case is: 4:15-bk-43239
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Edward L Morris |
Case #: | 4:15-bk-43240 |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc.
2707 Castroville Rd
San Antonio, TX 78237-3342 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago |
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 9/26/2022 (Chambers, Deanna) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Notice of Change of Address filed by Attorney Allen D. Russell. (Russell, Allen) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Withdrawal of claim(s): 23 Filed by Creditor Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Montelongo, Samantha) |
|
33 | 33
![]() Withdrawal of claim(s): 24 Filed by Creditor Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Montelongo, Samantha) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Objection to claim(s) 4 of Creditor(s) Marquette Business Credit SPE I, LLC (Amended POC No. 4-2).. Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc.. (Forshey, J.) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
court
Meeting of creditors held
Fri 10/09 1:11 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 10/9/2015 (Ziegler, Elizabeth) |
||
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Statement of financial affairs (amended) . Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc.. (Forshey, J.) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Statement of financial affairs (amended) . Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc.. (Forshey, J.) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Certificate of service re: (supplemental) - Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, & Deadlines and Proof of Claim form filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. . (Forshey, J.) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
![]() List of equity security holders filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc.. (Forshey, J.) |
|
27 | 27
![]() Statement of financial affairs . Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. . (Forshey, J.) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Schedules A, B, D-H with Summary of Schedules. Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. . (Forshey, J.) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Support/supplemental document - Exhibit A to Supplemental Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. . (Forshey, J.) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Certificate of service re: - Supplemental Certificate of Service of Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, & Deadlines and Proof of Claim form filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. . (Forshey, J.) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Certificate of service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, & Deadlines, and Proof of Claim form filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. . (Forshey, J.) |
|
Sunday, August 16, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/16/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, August 15, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/15/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
![]() BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/13/2015. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 4:15-bk-43239 with member case 4:15-bk-43240 , Judge Russell F. Nelms assigned. Involvement of Judge D. Michael Lynn terminated. Entered on 8/13/2015. ( Claims to be filed in each separate case, all other pleadings should be filed in the Lead case ) (Maldino, Mark) Modified to add "( Claims ... case )" on 8/13/2015 (Maldino, Mark) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/9/2015 at 10:30 AM at FTW 341 Rm 7A24. Proofs of Claims due by 1/7/2016. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 09/14/2015. (Neary, William) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Order granting motion (I) prohibiting utility companies from altering, refusing or discontinuing service & (II) granting related relief, . Entered on 8/13/2015. (Maldino, Mark) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Order granting motion to pay pre-petition debt (wages, employee benefits & insurance premiums) . Entered on 8/13/2015. (Maldino, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Amended Witness and Exhibit List in Connection with Emergency Hearings Set for August 13, 2015 filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. . (Forshey, J.) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Witness and Exhibit List in Connection with Emergency Hearings Set for August 13, 2015 filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. . (Forshey, J.) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Motion for expedited hearin Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. (Forshey, J.) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Motion to sell property free and clear of liens under Section 363(f) - Debtors' Motion for Orders (a) Approving Sale of Substantially All Assets Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Other Interests, (b) Approving Bidding Procedures in Advance of Auction, and (c) Granting Related Relief Fee amount $176, Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. (Forshey, J.) |
|
crditcrd
none
Wed 08/12 1:52 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sell 15-43240 dml11) [motion,msell] ( 176.00). Receipt number 21027006, amount $ 176.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Emergency Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. . Hearing to be held on 8/13/2015 at 10:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Nelms Ctrm. for6 and for7 and for4 and for5 , (Forshey, J.) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Notice of deficiency. Schedule A due 8/24/2015. Schedule B due 8/24/2015. Schedule D due 8/24/2015. Schedule E due 8/24/2015. Schedule F due 8/24/2015. Schedule G due 8/24/2015. Schedule H due 8/24/2015. Summary of Schedules and Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data 28 USC sec. 159 due 8/24/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/24/2015. (Luna, G) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Creditor matrix and Verification . Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc.. (Forshey, J.) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Motion for expedited hearin Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. (Forshey, J.) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Motion regarding utilities. Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 366(b) for an Order (i) Prohibiting Utility Companies from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service and (ii) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. (Forshey, J.) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Motion to pay pre-petition debt - Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Wages, Employee Benefits, and Insurance Premiums Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. (Forshey, J.) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Motion to use cash collateral Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. (Forshey, J.) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Motion for joint administration of cases AMSCO Steel Company, LLC, Case No. 15-43239 rfn-11 and Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc., Case No. 15-43240 dml-11 Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. (Forshey, J.) |
|
3 | 3
![]() 20 Largest unsecured creditors . Filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc.. (Forshey, J.) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. filed by Debtor Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc.. (Forshey, J.) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Pyndus Steel & Aluminum Co., Inc. (Forshey, J.) |
|
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 15-43240 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 21017125, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 08/10 1:53 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 15-43240 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 21017125, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |