Member Case
Lead case is: 1:08-bk-10832

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:08-bk-10833
Case Filed:May 02, 2008
Converted:Feb 26, 2010
Terminated:Oct 23, 2018

Debtor
Linens 'n Things, Inc.
6 Brighton Rd
Clifton, NJ 07012-1647
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Charles M. Forman
Forman Holt Eliades & Youngman LLC 80 Route 4 East Suite 290
Paramus, NJ 07652
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 01/10/2023 9:47 AM EST
Friday, May 02, 2008
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (GVW, )
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1039. Filed by Linens 'n Things, Inc. (Collins, Mark) Modified on 5/5/2008 to delete duplicate text (MDW, ).
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion for Joint Administration Filed By Linens 'n Things, Inc. (Collins, Mark) Modified on 5/5/2008 to delete duplicate text (MDW, ).
Related: [-]
3 3 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 08-10833 [misc,volp11a] (1039.00). Receipt Number 3281771, amount $1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Of The Chapter 11 Cases Of Linens Holding Co., Linens 'n Things, Inc., Linens 'n Things Center, Inc., Bloomington, MN, L.T., Inc., Vendor Finance, LLC, LNT, Inc., LNT Services, Inc., LNT Leasing II, LLC, LNT West, Inc., LNT Virginia LLC, LNT Merchandising Company, LLC, LNT Leasing III, LLC And Citadel LNT, LLC. All Further Pleadings And Other Papers Shall Be Filed In, And All Further Docket Entries Shall Be Made In, Case Number 08-10832 Signed on 5/2/2008 (ALC, )
Related: [-]