Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:15-ap-80067
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2015
Terminated:Jun 27, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company
625 Pilot Road, Ste. 3
Las Vegas, NV 89119
Represented By
LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company
contact info
Defendant
LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory
PO Box 10587
Greenville, SC 29603
Represented By
LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory
contact info
Defendant
Resurgent Capital Services
55 Beattie Place, Suite 110, MS 425
Greenville, SC 29601
Represented By
Resurgent Capital Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy M Perkins
109 Shoalford Drive
Huntsville, AL 35806
Represented By
Amy K Tanner
Bond Botes Syskstus Tanner & Ezzell PC
contact info
Trustee
Michael Ford
Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 2388
Decatur, AL 35602


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Monday, June 27, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/27 10:43 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-80067 Closed (rfl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2015
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 11/06 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, November 03, 2015
19 19 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/03 2:12 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 11/3/2015. (rfl)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, October 29, 2015
17 17 misc Brief Thu 10/29 8:05 PM
Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company, LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory, Resurgent Capital Services Related [+]. (Moore, Neal)
Related: [-] 11 Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #4; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding) Hearing scheduled 11/02/2015 at 01:30 PM at Decatur 3rd Floor (CRJ) Decatur. (mmb),12 Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #7; Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) Hearing scheduled 11/02/2015 at 01:30 PM at Decatur 3rd Floor (CRJ) Decatur. (mmb)
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
16 16 misc Brief Tue 10/20 11:28 AM
Brief Filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins Related [+]. (Tanner, Amy)
Related: [-] 13 Response to (Re Item:4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company, Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory) Filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins
15 15 misc Corrective Entry Tue 10/20 11:27 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Filed Brief in Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Using Incorrect Docket Event Filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins Related [+]. (Tanner, Amy)
Related: [-] 13 Response
Monday, October 19, 2015
14 14 court Incorrect Event (Notice of) Mon 10/19 2:20 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Amy Tanner, Attorney for the Plaintiff, has used an incorrect docket event when filing the Brief in Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. SOLUTION: The filer, Amy Tanner, Attorney for the Plaintiff, should enter a corrective entry, relate to document 13 then re-file the Brief using the correct docket event. Adversary>Notices>Brief. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. Related [+] (rfl)
Related: [-] 13 Response filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins
13 13 answer Response Mon 10/19 11:40 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins (Tanner, Amy)
Related: [-] Item:4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company, Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
12 12 court Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Tue 10/06 12:30 AM
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Related [+] Hearing scheduled 11/02/2015 at 01:30 PM at Decatur 3rd Floor (CRJ) Decatur. (mmb)
Related: [-] Doc #7; Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
11 11 court Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Tue 10/06 12:30 AM
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Related [+] Hearing scheduled 11/02/2015 at 01:30 PM at Decatur 3rd Floor (CRJ) Decatur. (mmb)
Related: [-] Doc #4; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
10 10 court Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Tue 10/06 12:30 AM
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Related [+] Hearing scheduled 11/02/2015 at 01:30 PM at Decatur 3rd Floor (CRJ) Decatur. (mmb)
Related: [-] Doc #1; Pretrial Conference-Complaint Seeking Damages in Adversary Proceeding for Violation of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act
Thursday, October 01, 2015
8 8 court Hearing Scheduled Thu 10/01 4:09 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 10/5/2015 at 01:30 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (rfl)
Related: [-] 7 Response filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins
7 7 answer Response Thu 10/01 1:55 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins (Tanner, Amy)
Related: [-] Item:4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company, Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory
Sunday, September 20, 2015
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Mon 09/21 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/20/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Hearing
Friday, September 18, 2015
5 5 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Fri 09/18 2:40 PM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 10/5/2015 at 01:30 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (rfl)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Resurgent Capital Services, Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company, Defendant LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory
Thursday, September 17, 2015
4 4 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/17 6:50 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company, LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory, Resurgent Capital Services (Moore, Neal)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/21 9:01 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Complaint by Amy M Perkins against LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company, LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory, Resurgent Capital Services. Receipt Number n/a, Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins,2 Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/5/2015 at 01:30 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (rfl)). (Tanner, Amy)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 15-80067 14 (Recovery of money/property - other)1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, August 18, 2015
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 08/18 8:15 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/5/2015 at 01:30 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (rfl)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Amy M Perkins
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/18 1:19 PM
Adversary case 15-80067 14 Related [+]) Complaint by Amy M Perkins against LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company, LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition Company c/o Resurgent Capital Services, Attn: Robin Underwood, Claim Signatory, Resurgent Capital Services. Receipt Number n/a, Fee Amount $350 (Tanner, Amy)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other