Original Case: 0:12-cv-62064

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-prici-13720
Typeprivate civil / diversity
Nature of Suit310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2015
Terminated:Jul 21, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 26, 2017 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
STACEY VEOLETTE SELLERS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Simon Waxtan
Represented By
John Michael Murray
Murray Morin & Herman, PA
contact info
Laurence Marc Krutchik
Murray Morin & Herman, PA
contact info
Michael G. Shannon
Murray Morin & Herman, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee-Cross Appellant
STACEY VEOLETTE SELLERS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Simon Waxtan
Represented By
John Michael Murray
Murray Morin & Herman, PA
contact info
Laurence Marc Krutchik
Murray Morin & Herman, PA
contact info
Michael G. Shannon
Murray Morin & Herman, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ISA ELISHA LAS, as personal representative of the Estate of Lilian Naicha Las
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AKINOLA COLE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of REVD. Ayoodeji Cole
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ADEBOOLA EYITAYO OLUWAYOMI, a personal representative of the Estates of Benson Olumuyiwa Oluwayomi
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NURWIYANTI, as personal representative of the Estate of Widyo Utomo
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LIVINUS ABUIYERE
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BLESSING NKEMDILIM OKEKE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Hope Okeke
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
IMMACULATA NNADI
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TITILOPE SHOBOWALE
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
FUNMILAYO FRANCIS
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MOBOLAJI KUDIRAT SOILE
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RAJI YUSUF
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ISMAILA IDRIS AGBOOLA OYEFESOBI
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES IZUCHUKWU OKAFOR
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GODWIN EBHODGAGHE
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANAYO-CHUKWU ONYEYIRI
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NJOKU CHIMA EMMANUEL
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN ALLADE, as personal reprensentative of the Estate of Marlins Allade
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BABASOLA KOLAWOLE, as Personal Representative of the Estates of Fortune David-Kolawole and Eyinjuoluwa David-Kolawole
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHUKS C. OJUGBANA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Amaka C. Ojugbana and Christopher C. Ojugbana
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EDITH OYOSORO, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rajulie Oyosoro and Ugabio Uluabasi
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
OLUWAFUNMILAYO JONATHAN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dr. Abiodin Olasunkanmi Jonathan
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TEMITOPE OGUNDELE-OSUNBADE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of David Aderojuosunbade
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
PATIENCE EHIOGHAE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sonny A. Ehioghae
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HAUWA ALI YUSUF, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lt. Col. Ali Yusuf
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SAIDU AHMAD DUKAWA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mahmud Ahmad Dukawa
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GABRIEL NWAIWU, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Revd. Ngozi Cole
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL CHUKWUEMEKA UCHEGBU, as personal representative of the Estates of Chukwuebuka Philip Ochegbu
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRIDGET JUMBO OCHIGBO, as personal representative of the estate of Owoicho Jumbo Ochigbo
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HERBERT ONYEKWELU DIKE, as personal representative of the Estates of Chinwe Catherine Dike and Chukwuezugo Nnanyelu Dike
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
OKECHUKWU EMMANUEL OBI
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ABDULKARIM GARBA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Aisha Adbu Garba, Dr. Abdu Garba and Nabila Abdu Garba
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NASARE MSHELIA FEDEMURE, as co-personal representative of the estate of Sarah Mshelia
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HANNAH ABRAHAM ADIJOLOLA, a personal represntative of the Estates of Abraham Bamidele Adijolola
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
RAJI YUSUF
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
HAUWA ALI YUSUF
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
MICHAEL CHUKWUEMEKA UCHEGBU
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
MOBOLAJI KUDIRAT SOILE
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
TITILOPE SHOBOWALE
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
EDITH OYOSORO
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
ISMAILA IDRIS AGBOOLA OYEFESOBI
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
ANAYO-CHUKWU ONYEYIRI
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
ADEBOOLA EYITAYO OLUWAYOMI
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
BLESSING NKEMDILIM OKEKE
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
JAMES IZUCHUKWU OKAFOR
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
CHUKS C. OJUGBANA
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
TEMITOPE OGUNDELE-OSUNBADE
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
BRIDGET JUMBO OCHIGBO
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
OKECHUKWU EMMANUEL OBI
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
NURWIYANTI
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
NJOKU CHIMA EMMANUEL
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
LIVINUS ABUIYERE
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
HANNAH ABRAHAM ADIJOLOLA
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
JOHN ALLADE
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
AKINOLA COLE
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
HERBERT ONYEKWELU DIKE
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
SAIDU AHMAD DUKAWA
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
GODWIN EBHODGAGHE
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
PATIENCE EHIOGHAE
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
GABRIEL NWAIWU
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
NASARE MSHELIA FEDEMURE
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
FUNMILAYO FRANCIS
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
ABDULKARIM GARBA
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
OLUWAFUNMILAYO JONATHAN
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
BABASOLA KOLAWOLE
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
ISA ELISHA LAS
Represented By
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Curtis Bradley Miner
Colson Hicks Eidson
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross Appellee
IMMACULATA NNADI
Represented By
Joel S. Perwin
Joel S. Perwin, PA
contact info
Michael Scott Olin
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Alaina R. Fotiu-Wojtowicz
Michael S. Olin, PA
contact info
Arthur E. Ballen
Law Office of Arthur E. Ballen
contact info

GPO Jul 21 2017
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant-Cross Appellee Livinus Abuiyere, et al. in 15-13720, Appellant Livinus Abuiyere, et al. in 15-15801. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. [15-13720, 15-15801] (16-11977X as to 15-13720)

Docket last updated: 07/26/2017 4:28 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 19, 2015
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Akinola Cole, Doctor Saidu Ahmad Dukawa, Patience Ehioghae, Abdulkarim Garba, Oluwafunmilayo Jonathan, Babasola Kolawole, Gabriel Nwaiwu, Temitope Ogundele-Osunbade, Chuks C. Ojugbana, Doctor Edith Oyosoro and Hauwa Ali Yusuf on 08/19/2015. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellants brief is due on or before 09/28/2015. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief
Related: [-]