Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:05-bk-11341
Case Filed:May 10, 2005
Dismissed:Jun 27, 2011
Terminated:Jul 13, 2011
Plan Confirmed:Jan 20, 2006

Debtor
aaiPharma Inc.
2320 Scientific Park Drive
Wilmington, NC 28405
Represented By
Rebecca L. Booth
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill Thorp Reed
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Jason M. Madron
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Proposed Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Mark W. Eckard
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
TERMINATED PARTIES
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
Terminated: 07/01/2011
www.epiqsystems.com 757 Third Ave Third Floor
New York, NY 10017


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Friday, September 16, 2011
1235 1235 Final Claims Register in alphabetical and numerical order . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (JRK)
Related: [-]