California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:10-cv-01602
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2010
Terminated:Sep 12, 2011
Defendant
Joe Kim Trust
Defendant
Yoshino Sushi Restaurant, Inc.
Plaintiff
Robert McCarthy

GPO Aug 23 2011
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL: Hearing set for 8/30/2011 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/30/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 08/19/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.