North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: David S Cayer
Case #: 3:15-cv-00382
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2015
Terminated:Jan 08, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 17, 2016 8:04 AM EST
Defendant
The Vanguard Group, Inc.
Represented By
Shalanna L. Pirtle
Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein
contact info
Stacy K. Wood
Parker, Poe, Adams & Bernstein
contact info
Plaintiff
Leigh Ann Harris
10336 Troutman Rd.
Midland, NC 28107


Docket last updated: 07/17/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 25, 2016
23 23 appeal Mandate - USCA Thu 8:20 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal,22 Opinion - USCA 16-1113 . (thh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
22 22 2 pgs appeal Opinion - USCA Wed 2:23 PM
Unpublished Opinion from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals as to19 Notice of Appeal. 4th Circuit decision - Affirmed.(chh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
Thursday, February 04, 2016
21 21 appeal Case Number - USCA Thu 3:53 PM
USCA Case Number 16-1113 for19 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Ashley Webb. (chh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
20 20 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA Wed 2:59 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re19 Notice of Appeal (eef)
Related: [-]
19 19 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 2:58 PM
Pro Se NOTICE OF APPEAL as to18 Clerk's Judgment,17 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim, Order on Memorandum and Recommendations, by Leigh Ann Harris. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number CHD034520. (eef)
Related: [-]
appeal Electronic Record Transmitted Wed 3:01 PM
Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re:19 Notice of Appeal. (eef)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2016
18 18 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 3:29 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Order on Memorandum and Recommendations Fri 3:25 PM
ORDER granting 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; affirming 12 Memorandum and Recommendations and plaintiff's Objections 13 are overruled. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/8/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2015
16 16 respoth Response Fri 10:14 AM
Pro Se RESPONSE re15 Reply to Objection to Memorandum and Recommendation by Leigh Ann Harris. (eef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
15 15 respoth Reply to Objection to Memorandum and Recommendation Thu 12:23 PM
REPLY to Objection to12 Memorandum and Recommendations by The Vanguard Group, Inc..(Pirtle, Shalanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Unpublished Case
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
14 14 misc Exhibit Wed 11:27 AM
Exhibit by Leigh Ann Harris. Exhibit 9 to13 Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations (eef)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2015
13 13 respoth Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations Mon 2:25 PM
Pro Se OBJECTION to12 Memorandum and Recommendations by Leigh Ann Harris. Replies due by 12/3/2015 (eef)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2015
12 12 11 pgs motion Memorandum and Recommendations Fri 1:39 PM
MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Order on 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Vanguard Group, Inc. Objections to M&R due by 11/23/2015. All further proceedings in this action, including all discovery, are STAYED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/6/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob) Modified on 11/10/2015 to correct case (tob).
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
11 11 2 pgs respm Surreply Mon 12:25 PM
Pro Se Surreply as to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Leigh Ann Harris. (eef)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2015
10 10 8 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 5:39 PM
RESPONSE in Support re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Pirtle, Shalanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
9 9 8 pgs respm Response to Motion Tue 2:13 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Leigh Ann Harris. Replies due by 10/30/2015 (jlk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2015
8 8 order Order on Motion for Hearing Thu 2:06 PM
ORDER denying 7 Pro Se MOTION for Hearing (Oral Response) re 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is allowed until November 2, 2015 to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/1/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Hearing Thu 10:31 AM
Pro Se MOTION for Hearing (Oral Response) re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Leigh Ann Harris. Responses due by 10/19/2015 (eef)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 11:47 AM
Motion referred to David S. Cayer.:7 MOTION for Hearing re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (eef)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 2:13 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 11/2/2015 (eef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 8:30 AM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 10/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/14/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2015
5 5 motion Extension of Time Fri 3:00 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Leigh Ann Harris. Responses due by 9/28/2015 (jlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
utility Motions Referred Mon 8:13 AM
Motion referred to David S. Cayer.:3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (jlk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
4 4 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 3:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Vanguard Group, Inc..(Pirtle, Shalanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Unpublished Case Law
3 3 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Fri 3:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Pirtle, Shalanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10:00 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (eef)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 1:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Vanguard Group, Inc. (Pirtle, Shalanna)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from General Court of Justice, Superior Ct. Div., Mecklenburg Co., NC, case number 15-cvs-13676. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-2746882), filed by The Vanguard Group, Inc..(Pirtle, Shalanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: State Court File for 15-cvs-13676 in the General Court of Justice, Superior Court Division for Mecklenburg Co., NC,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet