Black v. Rutherford County Sheriff's Department et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00918 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 17, 2016 7:13 AM CST |
Defendant
Robert Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rutherford County Sheriff's Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rutherford County, Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McKayla Black
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 08/24 12:02 PM
Case file destroyed this date. (mg) |
||
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/18 11:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Rutherford County, Tennessee. (Cope, Edward) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 07/18 2:16 PM
Case Terminated per33 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Rutherford County, Tennessee. No order to enter. (dt) |
||
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/09 3:03 PM
NOTICE by Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department of Deposition of Brent Noll (Mantooth, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/08 2:12 PM
NOTICE by Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department of Deposition of Mike Black (Mantooth, David) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/08 2:11 PM
NOTICE by Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department of Deposition of Connie Black (Mantooth, David) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/08 2:09 PM
NOTICE by Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department of Deposition of Misty Black (Mantooth, David) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/08 2:08 PM
NOTICE by Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department of Deposition of Katie Love (Mantooth, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Joint Statement
Wed 06/01 8:48 AM
JOINT Statement Joint Mediation Report . (Mantooth, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order to Ascertain Status
Wed 05/25 11:33 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Ascertain Status of Motion to Amend Answer. DE#19 Motion was granted. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/25/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) |
|
25 | 25
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/25 11:32 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Rutherford County, Tennessee. (dt) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 05/25 11:29 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Amend Answer. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/25/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Ascertain Status
Tue 05/24 4:14 PM
First MOTION to Ascertain Status of Rutherford County, Tennessee Motion to Amend Its Answer re19 by Rutherford County, Tennessee. (Cope, Edward) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/23 4:17 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Robert Arnold. (dt) |
|
21 | 21
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/23 4:16 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Rutherford County Sheriff's Department. (dt) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 05/23 3:47 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Amend Answer. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/23/16. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 05/23 9:03 AM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct12 Answer to Complaint by Rutherford County, Tennessee.(Cope, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 05/19 2:42 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer by Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department.(Mantooth, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant Rutherford County Sheriff's Office's Amended Answer to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendant Robert Arnold's Amended Answer to Complaint | ||
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 04/11 2:03 PM
ORDER: Motion16 GRANTED. Discovery deadline extended to 7/1/2016. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/11/16. (afs) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 04/08 11:05 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department. (Mantooth, David) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/03 9:43 AM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 12/6/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2016 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 11/29/2016. Witness List due by 11/29/2016. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/29/2016. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/2/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 11/03 9:04 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2016. Discovery due by 6/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2016. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/2/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs) |
|
minutes
Case Management Conference
Mon 11/02 2:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference held on 11/2/2015. Joint mediation report due 6/1/16. (kb) |
||
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Case Management Order
Fri 10/23 10:23 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by McKayla Black. (Fann, Terry) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/21 10:59 AM
Rutherford County, Tennessee's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Rutherford County, Tennessee.(Cope, Edward) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/18 3:45 PM
Defendant Rutherford County Sheriff's Department's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Rutherford County Sheriff's Department.(Mantooth, David) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/18 3:45 PM
Defendant Robert Arnold's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Robert Arnold.(Mantooth, David) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 09/16 2:47 PM
BAR STATUS for Attorneys, David Randall Mantooth and Christen C. Blackburn of TN, verified as active on this date. (afs) |
||
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/14 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Randall Mantooth on behalf of Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department (Mantooth, David) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 09/02 8:49 AM
Bar status for attorneys Edward Evan Cope and Nicholas Clinton Christiansen of TN verified as active on this date. (eh) |
||
Tuesday, September 01, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/01 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Clinton Christiansen on behalf of Rutherford County, Tennessee (Christiansen, Nicholas) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/01 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Evan Cope on behalf of Rutherford County, Tennessee (Cope, Edward) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/28 4:15 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by McKayla Black. (Fann, Terry) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/28 4:14 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by McKayla Black. (Fann, Terry) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/28 4:12 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by McKayla Black. McKayla Black served on 8/28/2015. (Fann, Terry) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Fri 08/21 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2015 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ds) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/21 3:34 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department, and Rutherford County, Tennessee. The original summonses and service packet were returned to counsel to effect service. (ds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/21 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Robert Arnold, Rutherford County Sheriff's Department, and Rutherford County, Tennessee (Filing fee $400.00, Receipt number 34675037660) filed by McKayla Black.. (ds) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 08/21 3:32 PM
BAR STATUS of Attorneys Benjamin Parsley and Terry Fann of TN verified as active as of this date. (ds) |