California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:15-cv-03751
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2015
Terminated:Feb 03, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Feb 13, 2016 5:19 AM PST
Defendant
Google Inc.
Represented By
Michael Henry Page
Durie Tangri LLP
contact info
Joseph Charles Gratz
Durie Tangri LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Gratz
Durie Tangri
contact info
Michael H. Page
Durie Tangri LLP
contact info
Ragesh K. Tangri
Durie Tangri LLP
contact info
Adam R Brausa
Durie Tangri LLP
contact info
Daniel G. Booth
Booth Sweet LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriela Rojas-Lozano
Represented By
Thomas G. Shapiro
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Thomas G Shapiro
Shapiro Haber And Urmy, LLP
contact info
Robert C. Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Noah M. Schubert
Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP
contact info
Patrick J. Vallely
Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP
contact info
Patrick Vallely
Shapiro Haber Urmy LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 12 2015
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the reasons, the Court ALLOWS Defts' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California - 12 and declines to rule on Defts' Motion to Dismiss. (Finn, Mary)
GPO Feb 03 2016
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 52 Motion to Dismiss UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)

1. Judge tosses proposed class action accusing Google of CAPTCHA fraud (arstechnica.com)
Submitted Tue 02/09/2016
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
63 63 1 pgs order Judgment Wed 02/03 2:09 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/3/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
Related: [-]
62 62 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 02/03 2:00 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 52 Motion to Dismiss UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
Related: [-]