Osei v. University of Maryland University College et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah K Chasanow |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-02502 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Mar 01, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 17, 2016 7:51 AM EST |
Defendant
Terrence Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Julie Lindenmeier
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Javier Miyares
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lynette O'Leary
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clairbourne W. Patty
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Office of Financial Aid, UMUC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
University of Maryland University College
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Osei
3016 North Broad St
Philadelphia, PA 19132 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 27, 2022 | ||
115 | 115
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 07/27 10:17 AM
MANDATE The judgment of this court, entered March 22, 2022, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure of USCA as to102 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Osei (jb5s, Deputy Clerk) |