Washington Alliance of Techno v. DHS
Original Case: 1:14-cv-00529
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cvus-05239 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 19, 2016 7:19 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Washington Alliance of Technology Workers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/19/2016 7:19 AM EDT |
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 15-5239 | ||
NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1569662] by Washington Alliance of Technology Workers seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00529-ESH. Assigned USCA Case Number 15-5239 | ||
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1569670] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/24/2015. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 09/24/2015. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/24/2015. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/24/2015. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/24/2015. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 09/24/2015. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/24/2015. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/24/2015. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/09/2015; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 09/24/2015. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/24/2015. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/24/2015. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/09/2015 15-5239 |