LANGLEY v. SELENE FINANCE, LP et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Steven C Mannion |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-06466 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 23, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 23, 2016 8:22 AM EST |
Defendant
JOHN DOES I-X
|
|
Defendant
SELENE FINANCE, LP
|
|
Plaintiff
PAULETTE LANGLEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 01/13 2:32 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL between parties, w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/13/16. (DD, ) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/12 11:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by SELENE FINANCE, LP. (CAROLLO, SALVATORE) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Wed 01/06 10:00 AM
Letter from Adam Deutsch. (DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Wed 12/09 3:51 PM
TEXT ORDER: Counsel shall appear before Judge Mannion for a status conference in Courtroom 2B on 1/14/16 at 3:00 p.m. By 1/6/16, counsel shall respectively fax confidential letters (up to 3 pgs) to Judge Mannion regarding the break down in settlement). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/9/15. (SCM) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Tue 12/08 3:27 PM
Letter from Adam Deutsch re12 Letter,13 Order Dismissing Case. (DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 11/23 11:11 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE as settled, w/out prejudice & w/out costs. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/23/15. (DD, ) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Fri 11/20 4:59 PM
Letter from Adam Deutsch. (DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 10/30 3:06 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME for deft., SELENE FINANCE, LP to answer Cmp. until 11/11/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/28/15. (DD, ) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 10/30 3:08 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document11 Stipulation and Order submitted by SELENE FINANCE, LP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/11/15. (DD, ) |
||
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Wed 10/28 10:54 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint by SELENE FINANCE, LP. (CAROLLO, SALVATORE) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 10/15 10:41 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to seal the complt.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/13/2015. (nr, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/14 11:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Second MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint . Motion set for 11/2/2015 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, ) |
||
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 10/09 5:10 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct6 Second MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint by PAULETTE LANGLEY.(DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Att: 1 Statement Letter from AD, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/05 9:47 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to6 Second MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint . Motion set for 11/2/2015 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, ) |
||
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Fri 10/02 2:43 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by PAULETTE LANGLEY. SELENE FINANCE, LP served on 9/18/2015, answer due 10/9/2015. (DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Seal Document
Fri 10/02 12:44 PM
Second MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint by PAULETTE LANGLEY.(DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Tue 09/22 1:29 PM
ORDER denying w/out prejudice3 Motion to Seal Document1 Complaint; that counsel may file a new motion to seal after the deficiencies have been corrected no later than 10/2/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/22/15. (DD, ) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/28 12:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by PAULETTE LANGLEY.(DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3
motion
Seal Document
Fri 08/28 12:39 PM
First MOTION to Seal Document Initial Complaint by PAULETTE LANGLEY.(DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/28 9:28 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SELENE FINANCE, LP Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *MARIA F. GARCIA* (mfg, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/28 1:13 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to3 First MOTION to Seal Document Initial Complaint . Motion set for 9/21/2015 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, ) |
||
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES I-X, SELENE FINANCE, LP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6607846) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PAULETTE LANGLEY.(mfg, ) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |