Friends of the Santa Clara, et al v. US Army Corps of Engineers, et al
Original Case: 2:14-cv-01667
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-56337 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 11, 2018 1:38 AM PDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KIMBERLY COLLOTON, in her official capacity as Commander and District Engineer of the Los Angeles District of the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor-Defendant - Appellee
THE NEWHALL LAND AND FARMING COMPANY, a California limited partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
WISHTOYO FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
VENTURA COASTKEEPER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
FRIENDS OF THE SANTA CLARA RIVER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SANTA CLARITA ORGANIZATION FOR PLANNING THE ENVIRONMENT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SANTA YNEZ BAND OF CHUMASH MISSION INDIANS OF THE SANTA YNEZ RESERVATION
|
Represented By
|
1. | Newhall Ranch Development Lawsuit Appeal Denied By Ninth Circuit Federal Court (hometownstation.com) |
Submitted Fri 04/13/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/11/2018 1:32 AM PDT |