New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:15-cv-06626
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2015
Terminated:Dec 20, 2018
Last checked: Monday Feb 29, 2016 8:33 AM EST
Defendant
FELICIAN COLLEGE
Represented By
GEORGE KAROUSATOS
Biancamano & Di Stefano, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
YVONNE RALEY
216 9TH STREET, APT. 4A
JERSEY CITY, NJ 07302


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
70 70 appeal USCA Mandate (Terminates Appeal) Tue 06/09 10:32 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to64 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by YVONNE RALEY (Finance notified)(ca3sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Opinion
appeal Mandate Notice Tue 06/09 2:47 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 6/9/2020. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (qa, )
Related: [-]