California Northern District Court
Judge:Lucy H Koh
Case #: 5:15-cv-04062
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2015
Re-opened:May 19, 2016
Terminated:Feb 05, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 02, 2016 5:03 AM PST
Defendant
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043
Represented By
Whitty Somvichian
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Matera
Represented By
Nicole Diane Sugnet
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Michael W. Sobol
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Ray Edwin Gallo
Gallo LLP
contact info
Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Lieff Cabraser Et Al
contact info
Dominic R Valerian
Gallo LLP
contact info
Joseph Henry Bates, III
Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC
contact info

GPO Feb 05 2016
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Motion to Stay (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016) **THE CLERK OF THE COURT IS DIRECTED TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THE CASE FILE** Modified on 2/8/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
GPO Apr 28 2016
ORDER Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/28/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
GPO May 25 2016
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/25/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
GPO Aug 12 2016
ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss as to the Merits of Plaintiff's Claims. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/12/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
GPO Sep 23 2016
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Google's motion to dismiss based on lack of standing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/23/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
GPO Mar 15 2017
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 62 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2017)

1. Google changes email scanning process to evade privacy lawsuit (theverge.com)
Submitted Thu 12/15/2016
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 09, 2018
103 103 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 02/09 5:54 PM
Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 96 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
Related: [-]
102 102 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 02/09 5:52 PM
Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Attorney Fees.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
Related: [-]
101 101 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 02/09 12:02 PM
Declaration of David F. Slade in Support of97 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Service Awards filed byDaniel Matera. Related [+] (Slade, David) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
Related: [-] 97
Thursday, February 08, 2018
100 100 oth_sup Declaration in Support Thu 02/08 8:07 PM
Declaration of Michael W. Sobol in Support of97 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Service Awards , 99 Motion Hearing,, Supplemental Declaration of Michael Sobol in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Service Awards filed byDaniel Matera. Related [+] (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
Related: [-] 97 , 99
99 99 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 02/08 2:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Motion for Settlement and Attorney Fees held on 2/8/2018 from 1:35 - 2:15 PM (40 minutes). A forthcoming Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the hearing. For Plaintiff(s): Melissa Ann Gardner, Michael W. Sobol, and David F. Slade. For Defendant(s): Whitty Somvichian. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2018)
Related: [-]