Tang v. Citizens Bank, N.A., et al
Original Case: 1:14-cv-12550
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-civil-02003 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Sep 04, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Friday May 20, 2016 6:54 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
CITIZENS BANK, a/k/a RBS Citizens, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RBS CITIZENS, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP, a/k/a RBS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID NACKLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITIZENS BANK, a/k/a RBS Citizens, N.A., a/k/a Citizens, N.A, a/k/a Citizens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
XIAOYAN TANG
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 19 2016
OPINION issued by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. Published. [15-2003] |
Docket last updated: 05/20/2016 6:54 AM EDT |
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #91) filed by Appellant Xiaoyan Tang. Transcript Report/Order form due 09/18/2015. 15-2003 (GA) |