Delphi Automotive Systems LLC
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 1:05-bk-44640 |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2005 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2013 |
Debtor
Delphi Automotive Systems LLC
5725 Delphi Dr
Troy, MI 48098-2815 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 12/17/2013 7:00 PM EST |
Saturday, October 08, 2005 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 05-44640 [misc,824] ( 839.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 3346761. Fee amount 839.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Case Joint Adminstration (Bush, Brent). | ||
1 | 1 21 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Delphi Automotive Systems LLC . Filed by Kayalyn A. Marafioti of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP on behalf of Delphi Automotive Systems LLC. (Marafioti, Kayalyn) | |
2 | 2 Notice of Proposed Order Motion For Order Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) Authorizing Joint Administration . (Butler, John) | |
3 | 3 30+ pgs Notice of Proposed Order Motion For Order Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) Authorizing Joint Administration . (Butler, John) | |
4 | 4 11 pgs Order signed on October 8, 2005 by Judge Arthur J. Gonzalez Granting Motion for Joint Administration for Case Nos. 05-44480 2, 05-44484 05-44503 05-44507 05-44511 05-44529 05-44536 05-44539 05-44542 05-44547 05-44554 05-44558 05-44567 05-44570 05-44573 05-44577 05-44580 05-44583 05-44586 05-44589 05-44591 05-44593 05-44596 05-44610 05-44612 05-44615 05-44618 05-44623 05-44624 05-44627 05-44632 05-44633 05-44636 05-44638 40. All Entries Shall Be Made Under Lead Case No. 05-44481 (Bush, Brent) |