Original Case: 2:13-cv-02702

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-56362
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2015
Terminated:Apr 04, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 05, 2016 3:56 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Represented By
Paul W. Schmidt
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Michael X. Imbroscio
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Kathleen E. Paley
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
David E. Stanley
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Phyllis Alene Jones
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PETER LOWRY
Plaintiff - Appellant
CLAUDIA HERRERA
Represented By
Brent Wisner
Baum, Hedlund, Aristei & Goldman PLC
contact info
Bijan Esfandiari
Baum, Hedlund, Aristei & Goldman PLC
contact info
Michael L. Baum
BAUM HEDLUND, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/05/2016 3:51 AM PDT
Tuesday, September 08, 2015
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/15/2015. Transcript ordered by 10/05/2015. Transcript due 01/04/2016. Appellant Claudia Herrera opening brief due 02/16/2016. Appellee Eli Lilly and Company answering brief due 03/17/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9673968] (FB) [Entered: 09/08/2015 08:58 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 Filed representation statement. Served on 09/04/2015. [9673972] (FB) [Entered: 09/08/2015 09:01 AM]
Related: [-]