Sebelen Medina et al v. FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Aida M Delgado-Colon |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-02250 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 08, 2016 9:44 AM AST |
Defendant
FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scotiabank of Puerto Rico as Successor to R-G Premier Bank
|
|
Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scotiabank of Puerto Rico
|
|
Plaintiff
Betsie Marie Corujo Martinez
|
|
Plaintiff
Roberto Sebelen Medina
|
|
Plaintiff
Betsie Marie Corujo-Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roberto Sebelen-Medina
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Judgment
Wed 08/03 3:23 PM
JUDGMENT. The claims against FDIC-R are HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Any remaining claims against co-defendant Scotiabank are remanded to State Court. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2016.(sr) |
|
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order
Tue 08/02 12:45 PM
ORDER re29 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Scotiabank of Puerto Rico, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Noted. The claims against FDIC-R are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Any remaining claims against co-defendant Scotiabank are remanded to State Court. Clerk of Court is to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/1/2016.(wm) |
|
Sunday, July 31, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Sun 07/31 5:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Scotiabank of Puerto Rico. (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order
Thu 02/25 4:58 PM
ORDER re26 MOTION for Leave to File Document MOTION Submitting Translation re:8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Exhaustion of Statutorily Mandated Administrative Remedies . Granted and Noted. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/25/2016.(wm) |
|
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 02/24 1:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to All Plaintiffs filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/14/2016(Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - Docket Report, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh B - Statement Donald G. Grieser, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Statement of Donald G. Grieser, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh 2 to Statement of Donald G. Grieser | ||
26 | 26
motion
Leave to File Document Submitting
Wed 02/24 12:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document , MOTION Submitting Translation re:8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Exhaustion of Statutorily Mandated Administrative Remedies filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/14/2016 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Translation of D. 8-2 | ||
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Fri 11/13 11:12 AM
ORDER re24 Motion submitting Translation to Substitute Document Filed at Docket 16-2. Noted and Granted. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/13/2015. (wm) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Submitting
Thu 11/12 5:44 PM
MOTION Submitting Subtitute for D.16-2 re:16 MOTION Submitting Translations re:4 MOTION Submitting Documents filed in Local Court re:1 Notice of Removal filed by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/3/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Sustitute for D.16-2 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 11/12 10:59 AM
ORDER re22 INFORMATIVE Motion MOTION for Reconsideration re 21 Order on Motion Submitting. Noted and Denied. The Court has already accepted ECF No. 17-2 as translated pursuant to Local Rule 5(g). The Court noted that ECF No. 16-2 (which corresponds to ECF No. 4-2) is still missing the certifed translation required by Local Rule 5(g). Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/12/2015.(wm) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Informative Motion Reconsideration
Mon 11/09 12:01 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion, MOTION for Reconsideration re 21 Order on Motion Submitting, filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/30/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Wed 10/28 6:07 PM
ORDER re16 Motion submitting. Noted and Granted, in part. The Court notes that ECF No. 16-2 is missing the certified translation required by Local Rule 5(g). Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/28/2015. (wm) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Wed 10/28 6:04 PM
ORDER re17 Motion submitting. Noted and GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/28/2015. (wm) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Wed 10/28 6:03 PM
ORDER re18 Motion submitting. Noted and Granted. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/28/2015. (wm) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Submitting
Mon 10/26 2:21 PM
MOTION Submitting Translations re:6 Third MOTION Submitting Documents from Local Court re:1 Notice of Removal filed by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Translation to Docket 6-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Translation to Docket 6-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Translation to Docket 6-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Translation to Docket 6-4 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Submitting
Mon 10/26 2:18 PM
MOTION Submitting Translations re:5 Second MOTION Submitting Documents from Local Court re:1 Notice of Removal filed by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Translation to Docket 5-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Translation to Docket 5-2 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Submitting
Mon 10/26 2:14 PM
MOTION Submitting Translations re:4 MOTION Submitting Documents filed in Local Court re:1 Notice of Removal filed by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Translation of Docket 4-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Translation of Docket 4-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Translation of Docket 4-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Translation of Docket 4-4 | ||
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 09/14 12:27 PM
ORDER re9 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents as exhibits to Motion for Stay MOTION for Extension of Time until October 26, 2015 to file translations from Spanish language filed by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank. GRANTED. Translations due by 10/26/2015. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/14/2015.(wm) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 09/14 12:05 PM
ORDER re7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Granted. Translations due 10/26/2015. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/14/2015. (wm) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Mon 09/14 12:03 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion submitting. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/14/2015. (wm) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Mon 09/14 12:01 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion submitting. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/14/2015. (wm) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Mon 09/14 12:00 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion submitting. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/14/2015. (wm) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 09/11 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Leave to File Spanish language documents Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 09/10 3:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents as exhibits to Motion for Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time until October 26, 2015 to file translations from Spanish language filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Stay
Thu 09/10 2:38 PM
MOTION to Stay STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING EXHAUSTION OF STATUTORILY MANDATED ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2015(Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Appointment and Acceptance, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Substitution | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 09/10 2:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until October 26, 2015 to file translations of documents filed in local court filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Submitting
Thu 09/10 2:26 PM
Third MOTION Submitting Documents from Local Court re:1 Notice of Removal filed by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Third Party Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Order denying, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Partial Judgment, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Order denying | ||
5 | 5
motion
Submitting
Thu 09/10 2:18 PM
Second MOTION Submitting Documents from Local Court re:1 Notice of Removal filed by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Orders denying motion to dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Answer to Complaint Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Answer to Complaint Part 2 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Submitting
Thu 09/10 12:22 PM
MOTION Submitting Documents filed in Local Court re:1 Notice of Removal filed by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank filed by Courtney R. Carroll on behalf of FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2015 (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit Summons Doral | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/10 11:53 AM
NOTICE Category Sheet by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank re1 Notice of Removal (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/10 11:51 AM
NOTICE by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank re1 Notice of Removal (Carroll, Courtney) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 09/10 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance, San Juan Part, case number K AC2012-0938. (), filed by FDIC as Receiver for Doral Bank.(Carroll, Courtney) |