Kwake v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Mcshane |
Case #: | 6:15-cv-01713 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 12:2605 Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 08, 2016 5:52 AM PST |
Defendant
Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terri Kwake
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
155 | 155
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 12/13 2:44 PM
ORDER: Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss153 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
154 | 154
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 12/06 4:16 PM
Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 17-35238 17-35291 re Notice of Appeal143 and144 . (jk) |